This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:38:50 (UTC).

Oberhofer et al v. Hoffman et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Oberhofer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hoffman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Therese Wiley Dancks and Mae A. D'Agostino. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01511

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Emilia Gluck

Dennis Oberhofer

Leslie T. Oberhofer

Defendants

Thomas A. Hoffman

Traci Hoffman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eli B. Basch

Attorney at Basch & Keegan, LLP

P.O. Box 4235

Kingston, NY 12402

Defendant Attorney

Gregg D. Weinstock

Attorney at Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter LLP

300 Garden City Plaza, Ste 308

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Original State Court Complaint

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 2/4/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 6/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/7/2020. (sg ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas A. Hoffman, Traci Hoffman.(Weinstock, Gregg) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Thomas A. Hoffman and Traci Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Original State Court Complaint)(kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Leslie T. Oberhofer. (Basch, Eli) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#8

(#8) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Mandatory Disclosures to be exchanged no later than 1/10/2020. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 1/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/27/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2020. Mandatory Mediation deadline: 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 9/25/2020. Motions to be filed by 1/29/2021. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany NY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/7/2020. (sg ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ulster County Supreme Court, case number 19-2401. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4964255) filed by Thomas A. Hoffman and Traci Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Thomas A. Hoffman, Traci Hoffman. (Weinstock, Gregg) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Thomas A. Hoffman, Traci Hoffman. (Weinstock, Gregg) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE of Telephone Conference: A Telephone Status Conference has been set for 5/4/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Defendant counsel is directed to initiate the call and to contact Chambers at (315) 234-8618 (the dedicated conference line) once all counsel are on the line. (sg ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 2/4/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 6/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/7/2020. (sg ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Mandatory Disclosures to be exchanged no later than 1/10/2020. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 1/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 3/27/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/27/2020. Mandatory Mediation deadline: 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 9/25/2020. Motions to be filed by 1/29/2021. Anticipated length of trial: 5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany NY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/7/2020. (sg ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketTEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2020. Appearances: Derek Spada, Esq. o/b/o Eli Basch, Esq. for Plaintiffs; Gregg Weinstock, Esq. for Defendants. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. A Jury Demand is to be filed by 1/10/2020. Rule 26 Disclosures have not been exchanged and are now due 1/10/2020. Case is referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (Digitally Recorded)) (sg ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the letter filed by Plaintiff's counsel (Dkt. No. #6 -1 advising that Plaintiff's counsel will not be available for the 1/6/2020 Rule 16 Conference but that someone from their office could cover in his absence. Plaintiff's counsel has confirmed to the Court that someone from Plaintiff's counsel's office will cover this conference for Mr. Basch and, therefore, the 1/6/2020 telephone Rule 16 Conference will proceed as scheduled. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/2/2020. (sg) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Leslie T. Oberhofer. (Basch, Eli) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas A. Hoffman, Traci Hoffman.(Weinstock, Gregg) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • ***Answer due date set for Thomas A. Hoffman answer due 12/12/2019; Traci Hoffman answer due 12/12/2019. (kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • (#4) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Thomas A. Hoffman and Traci Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Original State Court Complaint)(kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ulster County Supreme Court, case number 19-2401. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4964255) filed by Thomas A. Hoffman and Traci Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.