This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:28:51 (UTC).

Oates v. Sands et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Oates filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sands. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02074

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emanuel David Joshua Oates

Defendants

Officer First Class Waugh

Officer First Class Sands

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darragh L Inman

Attorney at Rensin & Rosenstein, LLP

6200 Baltimore Avenue, Suite 400

Riverdale, MD 20737

Justin Lee Rosenstein

Attorney at Rensin & Rosenstein, LLP

6200 Baltimore Avenue Suite 400

Riverdale, MD 20737

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Constantine Sakles

Attorney at Baltimore County, Maryland

400 Washington Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Towson, MD 21204

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Report re: Deposition hours (Inman, Darragh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/24/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sands, Waugh.(Sakles, Christopher) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lee Rosenstein on behalf of Emanuel David Joshua Oates (Rosenstein, Justin) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Sands and Waugh. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Emanuel Oates of Request to Issue Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Inman, Darragh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8757556.), filed by Emanuel Oates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Inman, Darragh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report re: Deposition hours (Inman, Darragh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/24/2020. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sands, Waugh.(Sakles, Christopher) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lee Rosenstein on behalf of Emanuel David Joshua Oates (Rosenstein, Justin) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Sands and Waugh. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Emanuel Oates of Request to Issue Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Inman, Darragh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8757556.), filed by Emanuel Oates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Inman, Darragh) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less