This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2021 at 08:43:53 (UTC).

Oakman v. FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Oakman filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01284

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latosha Oakman

Defendant

FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaniel W Bax

Attorney at Foster Law Firm

Po Box 2123

Greenville, SC 29602

Defendant Attorney

William Kyle Dillard

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart (GREN)

300 North Main Street, Suite 500

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan.(alew, ) Refiled by clerk to correct event type. (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#13

(#13) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/7/2021. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/21/21. (kmca) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#12

(#12) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Stipulation Deadline 9/14/2021. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/21/21. (kmca) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan.(Dillard, William) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#7

(#7) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan answer due June 18, 2021. (Dillard, William) Modified on 6/1/2021: to add text (defendant's name and answer date) (kmca). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

5 #1

Green card

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latosha Oakman. FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green card)(Bax, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan. (kmca) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Latosha Oakman.(kmca) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9811235), filed by Latosha Oakman. Service due by 7/29/2021.(kmca) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan.(alew, ) Refiled by clerk to correct event type. (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 9/7/2021. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/21/21. (kmca) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Joint Stipulation Deadline 9/14/2021. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 6/21/21. (kmca) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan.(Dillard, William) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #6 Letter Extending Time to Answer. Reason: re-filed by attorney to correct document (converted pdf). Corrected Filing Document Number #7 Letter Extending Time to Answer. Corrected document filed same date as original filing: 5/27/21. (kmca) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan answer due June 18, 2021. (Dillard, William) Modified on 6/1/2021: to add text (defendant's name and answer date) (kmca). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latosha Oakman. FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Green card)(Bax, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan. (kmca) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Latosha Oakman.(kmca) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FedEx Office and Print Services Inc Long Term Disability Plan (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9811235), filed by Latosha Oakman. Service due by 7/29/2021.(kmca) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Kyle Dillard