This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 07:09:39 (UTC).

Oakley et al v. DeVos et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Oakley filed an Other lawsuit against DeVos. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03215

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Los Rios Community College District

State Center Community College District

Eloy Ortiz Oakley

Foothill-De Anza Community College District

San Diego Community College District

Los Angeles Community College District

California Community Colleges Board of Governors

Defendants

U.S. Department of Education

Betsy DeVos

Amicus Curiae

Santa Monica Community College District

Amicus Curiae 25 Counties, Cities, and Municipalities

Southwestern Community College District

San Jose - Evergreen Community College District

Rancho Santiago Community College District

Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District

South Orange County Community College District

National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Boulevard, #108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

San Francisco Community College District

Cabrillo College

Rio Hondo Community College District

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JP Sherry

Attorney at Los Rios Community College District

1919 Spanos Ct

Sacramento, CA 95825

Matthew T Besmer

Attorney at SCCCD

1171 Fulton Street

Fresno, CA 93721

Lee Isaac Sherman

Attorney at California Department of Justice

300 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Jasleen Kaur Singh

Attorney at California Department of Justice

300 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Julia Harumi Mass

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, Suite 2000, Oakland

Oakland, CA 94612

Shubhra Shivpuri

Attorney at Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor, P.O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Joshua Nathan Sondheimer

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate St., Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Christine Chuang

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

John A. Shupe

Attorney at Lynch and Shupe, LLP

316 Mid Valley Center, Suite 180

Carmel, CA 93923

Ljubisa Kostic

Attorney at San Diego Community College District

3375 Camino Del Rio South, Room 385

San Diego, CA 92108

Jeffrey Michael Prieto

Attorney at LACCD

770 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Andrew Zee

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

450 Golden Gate Avenue, Room 7-5395

San Francisco, CA 94102

Kathryn L Wyer

20 Massachusetts Ave., Nw, Room 7124

Washington, DC 20530

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Kelly M. Dermody

Attorney at Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Daniel R. Suvor

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Margaret Louise Carter

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

400 S. Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Nicholas David Espiritu

Attorney at National Immigration Law Center

3450 Wilshire Blvd #108-62

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Other Attorneys

Ali Mojibi

Attorney at Covington & Burling

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#45

RESTRICTED

#43

30 #2

Proposed Order

30 #1

Amicus Brief

#30

24 #2

Proposed Order

24 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion

16 #4

Appendix of Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunct

16 #1

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/09/2020, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@and.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #43 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2020. (Related documents(s) #43 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 7/9/2020) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #16 ; MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEFS #24 , #27 , #29 , #30 . (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/9/2020 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by California Community Colleges Board of Governors, Eloy Ortiz Oakley, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 6/16/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Statement re #40 Order on Interim Final Rule by California Community Colleges Board of Governors, Foothill-De Anza Community College District, Los Angeles Community College District, Los Rios Community College District, Eloy Ortiz Oakley, San Diego Community College District, State Center Community College District. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 6/14/2020) (Entered: 06/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Betsy DeVos, U.S. Department of Education (Attachments: #1 Order in State of Washington v. DeVos, No. 2:20-cv-182-TOR (E.D. Wash. June 12, 2020))(Wyer, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/13/2020) Modified on 6/15/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER re #39 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Department of Education, Betsy DeVos. Plaintiffs' statement filed by 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Forthcoming Interim Final Rule Publication by Betsy DeVos, U.S. Department of Education (Attachments: #1 Interim Final Rule (unofficial copy))(Wyer, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/11/2020) Modified on 6/12/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE re #37 Terminate Hearings,,, Motion Hearing,, by Betsy DeVos, U.S. Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-X - Federal Register documents)(Wyer, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/10/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2020 re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State Center Community College District, Eloy Ortiz Oakley, Los Angeles Community College District, San Diego Community College District, California Community Colleges Board of Governors, Los Rios Community College District, Foothill-De Anza Community College District Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 33 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/9/2020) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) RESPONSE re #35 Notice (Other) by California Community Colleges Board of Governors, Eloy Ortiz Oakley. (Attachments: #1 Attachments 1-4)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 6/9/2020) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Betsy DeVos, U.S. Department of Education. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Chuang on behalf of Plaintiffs Eloy Ortiz Oakley and Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges (Chuang, Christine) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Besmer Attorney for State Center Community College District (Besmer, Matthew) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JP Sherry (Sherry, JP) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JP Sherry (Sherry, JP) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Community Colleges Board of Governors, Foothill-De Anza Community College District, Los Angeles Community College District, Los Rios Community College District, Eloy Ortiz Oakley, San Diego Community College District, State Center Community College District.. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Injunctive, and Mandamus Relief against Betsy DeVos, U.S. Department of Education ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14458290.). Filed byState Center Community College District, Foothill-De Anza Community College District, San Diego Community College District, California Community Colleges Board of Governors, Los Rios Community College District, Eloy Ortiz Oakley, Los Angeles Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sherman, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANCHO SANTIAGO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DIST is a litigant

Latest cases where National Immigration Law Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Grossmont-Cuyamaca Community College District is a litigant

Latest cases where State Center Community College District is a litigant