This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 08:36:52 (UTC).

Nguyen v. Echopark Automotive Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Nguyen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Echopark Automotive Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Leigh Martin May and Linda T. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02381

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

Referral Judge

Linda T. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hong M Nguyen

Grayson, GA 30017

Defendants

Echopark Automotive Inc.

Sonic Automotive Inc.

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/17/2022. (kxm) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to send Plaintiff two copies of the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete both copies of the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, and to return one of each for the Defendant named in the complaint within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply in a timely manner could result in the dismissal of this civil action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/27/2022. (kxm) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Letter

4 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

USM-285 Form as to Echopark Automotive Inc.

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures

5 #2

Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Echopark Automotive Inc. on 8/3/2022. If waiver not returned by 9/7/2022, prepare personal service package. (kxm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Sonic Automotive Inc. on 8/3/2022. If waiver not returned by 9/7/2022, prepare personal service package. (kxm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Sonic Automotive Inc. on 8/3/2022. If waiver not returned by 9/7/2022, prepare personal service package. (kxm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Echopark Automotive Inc. on 8/3/2022. If waiver not returned by 9/7/2022, prepare personal service package. (kxm) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Hong M Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #2 Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures)(kxm) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Remark: Received completed USM 285 Forms. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form as to Echopark Automotive Inc.) (kxm) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Hong M Nguyen re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and two copies of the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form (kxm) Text Modified on 7/8/2022 (kxm). (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT filed by Hong M Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to send Plaintiff two copies of the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete both copies of the USM 285 form, summons, and the initial disclosures form, and to return one of each for the Defendant named in the complaint within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is warned that failure to comply in a timely manner could result in the dismissal of this civil action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/27/2022. (kxm) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Hong M Nguyen re #2 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (kxm) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/17/2022. (kxm) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for IFP and Frivolity Determination to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (jra) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for IFP and Frivolity Determination to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (jra) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hong M Nyugen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONIC AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant