This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 07:21:29 (UTC).

Nyong'o v. Sutter Health et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Nyong'o filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Sutter Health. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-06238

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Omondi Nyong'o

Defendants

Sutter Health

Palo Alto Foundation Medical Group ("PAFMG")

Palo Alto Medical Foundation ("PAMF")

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Hutchinson

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Jalle H. Dafa

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kelly M. Dermody

Attorney at Leiff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Defendant Attorneys

Alex Hernaez

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

345 California Streetsuite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Daniel V. Kitzes

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

345 California Stsuite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94104

Vijayta R Labat

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Maksukhani

275 Battery Streetste 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Marcie Isom Fitzsimmons

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Roy Mick Rubio

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

22 #1

Exhibit A to Supplemental Kitzes Declaration

#19

16 #4

Proposed Order

16 #3

Exhibit B - Complaint Redline

16 #2

Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint

16 #1

Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support Thereof

#16

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #4

Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties

1 #3

Declaration Kitzes Declaration In Support of Removal

1 #2

Declaration Fitzsimmons Declaration In Support Of Removal

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Roy Mick Rubio (Rubio, Roy) (Filed on 10/5/2021) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Remand to State Court ) filed byOmondi Nyong'o. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Declaration of Daniel V, Kitzes in Support of #19 Opposition/Response to Motion, #16 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Remand to State Court filed byPalo Alto Medical Foundation ("PAMF"), Sutter Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Kitzes Declaration)(Related document(s) #19 , #16 ) (Kitzes, Daniel) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #15 Clerk's Notice vacating the CMC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/29/2021. * The 10/4/2021 at 2:00PM Case Management Conference is VACATED.*(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) **ATTACHMENT INCORRECT. SEE DKT. 21 FOR CORRECT ENTRY AND ATTACHMENT** ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #15 Clerk's Notice Setting CMC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/29/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021) Modified on 9/29/2021 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Amend Complaint and Remand to State Court ) filed byPalo Alto Foundation Medical Group ("PAFMG"). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marcie Isom Fitzsimmons in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand (with Exhibits), #2 Proposed Order Denying Remand)(Fitzsimmons, Marcie) (Filed on 9/27/2021) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Omondi Nyong'o. (Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/23/2021) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Defendant's CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Case Management Order filed by Palo Alto Foundation Medical Group ("PAFMG"). (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) (Filed on 9/22/2021) Modified on 9/23/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Amend Complaint and Remand to State Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Omondi Nyong'o. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2021 at 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/27/2021. Replies due by 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly M. Dermody in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint Redline, #4 Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 9/13/2021) Modified on 9/14/2021 (jlgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 10/4/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference Only. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/21. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Sutter Health identifying Corporate Parent Palo Alto Medical Foundation ("PAMF"), Corporate Parent Sutter Bay Medical Foundation for Sutter Health. (Kitzes, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sutter Health.. (Kitzes, Daniel) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/27/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2021) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Palo Alto Foundation Medical Group ("PAFMG").. (Fitzsimmons, Marcie) (Filed on 8/26/2021) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11/11/20 21. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Vijayta R Labat (Labat, Vijayta) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-592714. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16277718). Filed byPalo Alto Foundation Medical Group ("PAFMG"). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Fitzsimmons Declaration In Support Of Removal, #3 Declaration Kitzes Declaration In Support of Removal, #4 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties)(Fitzsimmons, Marcie) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALO ALTO FOUNDATION MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Hernaez(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcie Isom Fitzsimmons(Designation Retained)