This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 07:28:30 (UTC).

NYL Holdings LLC v. Petra Industries LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 NYL Holdings LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Petra Industries LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joe Heaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00926

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joe Heaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

NYL Holdings LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Petra Industries LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Prescott E Kiplinger

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jeffrey A Curran

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Bradley K Donnell

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

211 N. Robinson, 10Th Floor Two Leadership Sq.

Okc, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER...as plaintiff is no longer pursuing claims for bad faith breach and declaratory judgment, the motion to dismiss #9 is stricken as moot. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/09/2020. (lam) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

14 #1

Exhibit 1 -- Vendor/Distributor Agreement

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against NYL Holdings LLC by Petra Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Vendor/Distributor Agreement)(Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

13 #3

Exhibit 3-Petra Inv 1054400

13 #2

Exhibit 2-Petra Inv 1054307

13 #1

Exhibit 1-Vendor-Dist Agreement

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Petra Industries LLC filed by NYL Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Vendor-Dist Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Petra Inv 1054307, #3 Exhibit 3-Petra Inv 1054400)(Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Counterclaim by NYL Holdings LLC.(Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Petra Industries LLC . (Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley K Donnell on behalf of Petra Industries LLC (Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Petra Industries LLC. (Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against NYL Holdings LLC by Petra Industries LLC.(Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NYL Holdings LLC. Petra Industries LLC served on 9/14/2020. (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Prescott E Kiplinger on behalf of NYL Holdings LLC (Kiplinger, Prescott) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by NYL Holdings LLC . (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of NYL Holdings LLC (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTER ORDER counsel for plaintiff is directed to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 09/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/14/2020. (lam) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Petra Industries LLC. (knt) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER...as plaintiff is no longer pursuing claims for bad faith breach and declaratory judgment, the motion to dismiss #9 is stricken as moot. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 11/09/2020. (lam) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against NYL Holdings LLC by Petra Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Vendor/Distributor Agreement)(Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Petra Industries LLC filed by NYL Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Vendor-Dist Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Petra Inv 1054307, #3 Exhibit 3-Petra Inv 1054400)(Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Counterclaim by NYL Holdings LLC.(Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Petra Industries LLC . (Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Bradley K Donnell on behalf of Petra Industries LLC (Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Petra Industries LLC. (Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against NYL Holdings LLC by Petra Industries LLC.(Donnell, Bradley) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NYL Holdings LLC. Petra Industries LLC served on 9/14/2020. (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Prescott E Kiplinger on behalf of NYL Holdings LLC (Kiplinger, Prescott) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by NYL Holdings LLC . (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of NYL Holdings LLC (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER counsel for plaintiff is directed to file an entry of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 09/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 09/14/2020. (lam) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3277100. (Curran, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Petra Industries LLC. (knt) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Petra Industries LLC filed by NYL Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Vendor-Dist Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petra Invoice 1054307, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petra Invoice 1054400, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less