This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:26:03 (UTC).

Nygaard v. Federation Internationale de l'Automobile et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Nygaard filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Federation Internationale de l'Automobile. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jens H.S. Nygaard

Defendants

Delta Topco Ltd.

Federation Internationale de l'Automobile

Ferrari S.p.A.

Formula One Management Ltd.

Mercedes-Benz Grand Prix Ltd.

Red Bull Technology Ltd.

Red Bull Racing Ltd.

Scuderia Ferrari S.p.A.

Dallara Automobili S.p.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle Joy Healey

Jackob Ben-Ezra

W. Thomas Jacks

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

3 #1

AO-120

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

4 #2

Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19

4 #1

Amended Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) Summons Issued as to Ferrari S.p.A.. (bw) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Federation Internationale de l'Automobile, Scuderia Ferrari S.p.A.. (bw) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Federation Internationale de l'Automobile, Mercedes-Benz Grand Prix Ltd., Red Bull Racing Ltd., Red Bull Technology Ltd.. (bw) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Federation Internationale de l'Automobile. (bw) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Formula One Management Ltd.. (bw) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Delta Topco Ltd.. (bw) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Dallara Automobili S.p.A.. (bw) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jens H.S. Nygaard. (corrected) (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jens H.S. Nygaard. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file upon opening of the case. Please use Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form event when e-filing AO120. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (bw) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020

DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13392941). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Jens H.S. Nygaard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Attachments: #1 Amended Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19, #2 Order from Chief Judge Garcia re COVID19)(mc5) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less