NXP USA, Inc. v. MediaTek Inc. et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32253988 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit 11 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 to Complaint, #13 Exhibit 13 to Complaint, #14 Exhibit 14 to Complaint, #15 Exhibit 15 to Complaint, #16 Exhibit 16 to Complaint, #17 Exhibit 17 to Complaint, #18 Exhibit 18 to Complaint, #19 Exhibit 19 to Complaint, #20 Exhibit 20 to Complaint, #21 Exhibit 21 to Complaint) (Attorney Steven John Corr added to party NXP USA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by NXP USA, Inc.. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blaney Harper. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Vishal V. Khatri. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc., Belkin International, Inc., Linksys USA, Inc., MediaTek Inc., MediaTek USA Inc.. (es) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#13) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 1/31/2022 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/24/2022. (lb) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blaney Harper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32338308) filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vishal V. Khatri to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32338313) filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Blaney Harper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32338308) #14 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vishal V. Khatri to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32338313) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 02/01/2022 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Stefani E Shanberg added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc., upon Defendant MediaTek USA Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melvin Bautista, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc., upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc., upon Defendant Belkin International, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melvin Bautista, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc., upon Defendant Linksys USA, Inc. served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melvin Bautista, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Smith, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #17 by Judge James V. Selna. It is hereby ORDERED THAT: The due date for Amazon to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter is extended to February 1, 2022. (es) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#23) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Blaney Harper APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of NXP USA, Inc., Plaintiff, designating Steven J. Corr as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#24) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Vishal V. Khatri APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of NXP USA, Inc., Plaintiff, designating Steven J. Corr as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 02/01/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Linksys USA, Inc., Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel B. Heidtke added to party Belkin International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel B. Heidtke added to party Linksys USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Heidtke, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docket(#27) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge James V. Selna, It is hereby ORDERED THAT: The due date for Defendants to file responses to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter is extended to February 1, 2022. Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time #26 . (es) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 1, 2022 filed by defendant MediaTek USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney James DuBois Judah added to party MediaTek USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Judah, James) (Entered: 12/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#29) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #28 by Judge James V. Selna. It is hereby ORDERED THAT: The due date for MediaTek to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter is extended to February 1, 2022. (es) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending ITC Proceeding filed by defendant MediaTek USA Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James D. Judah in support of Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Judah, James) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#31) MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Stay #30 by Judge James V. Selna. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion to stay the case pending the final resolution of the ITC investigation, including any and all appeals and until the Commission proceedings are no longer subject to judicial review. The parties are ordered to file a notice within fourteen days of final resolution of the ITC investigation, stating that resolution has occurred. Defendants will have thirty days from the lifting of the stay to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (lom) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less