This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 08:30:27 (UTC).

NXP USA, Inc. v. MediaTek Inc. et al

Case Summary

On November 1, 2021, NXP USA, Inc. (“NXP” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Steven John Corr of Jones Day, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against MediaTek, Inc., MediaTek USA Inc., (collectively, “MediaTek”), Amazon.com, Inc. (“Amazon”), Belkin International, Inc. (Belkin”), and Linksys USA, Inc. (“Linksys”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking declaratory relief plus damages along with pre and post-judgment interest, costs, and attorneys’ fees for the alleged infringement of Asserted Patents. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Central District of California. 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,593,202 (“the ’202 patent”) entitled “Electrostatic Discharge (ESD) Protection Circuit for Multiple Power Domain Integrated Circuit”, 8,482,136 (“the ’136 patent”) entitled “Fan-Out Chip Scale Package”, 8,558,591 (“the ’591 patent”) entitled “Phase Locked Loop with Power Supply Control”, 9,729,214 (“the ’214 patent”) entitled “Group Acknowledgement for Multiple User Communication in a Wireless Local Area Network”, and 10,904,058 (“the ’058 patent”) entitled “Padding for Orthogonal Frequency Division Multiplexing (OFDM) Symbols in a Wireless Communication System” (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”).

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “On information and belief, Defendants MediaTek and Amazon indirectly infringe the ’202 patent pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) and/or (c) by knowingly and intentionally inducing infringement and/or contributing to the infringement of the ’202 patent by, among other things, selling in the United States the Accused ’202 Products to direct infringers, that include, without limitation, customers and/or end users of those products. Those customers and/or end users of the Accused ’202 Products directly infringe one or more claims of one or more of the ’202 patent.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “On information and belief, Amazon, Belkin, and Linksys contribute to the infringement of one or more claims of the ’058 patent by, among others, end users, because they know that the Accused ’058 Products, including, specifically, their downstream products that incorporate the infringing integrated circuits, chipsets, and electronic devices, embody a material part of the claimed inventions of the ’058 patent, that they are specially made or specially adapted for use in an infringement of the claims, and that they are not staple articles of commerce suitable for substantial non-infringing use. See Exhibits 20 and 21.

The Plaintiff has also laid down similar allegations for the alleged infringement of other Asserted Patents.

The Plaintiff lists out five claims for relief, for the alleged infringement of each Asserted Patent, wherein the Plaintiff claimed that, in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a), the Defendants have infringed the Asserted Patents by making, using, selling, offering for sale, and/or importing into the United States, without authority, the Accused Asserted Patent Products. The Defendants have allegedly infringed literally and/or under the doctrine of equivalents.

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to grant a judgment that the Defendants have infringed each and every one of the Asserted Patents and for damages along with pre-judgment and post-judgment interest and attorneys’ fees, costs, expenses and such other relief as the Court deems just and equitable.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01810

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NXP USA, Inc.

Defendants

MediaTek Inc.

MediaTek USA Inc.

Amazon.com, Inc.

Belkin International, Inc.

Linksys USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven John Corr

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Vishal V. Khatri

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Blaney Harper

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Jonathan McNeal Smith

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

James DuBois Judah

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan LLP

50 California Street 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stefani E Shanberg

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Daniel B. Heidtke

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by NXP USA, Inc.. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

1 #19

Exhibit 19 to Complaint

1 #17

Exhibit 17 to Complaint

1 #16

Exhibit 16 to Complaint

1 #14

Exhibit 14 to Complaint

1 #13

Exhibit 13 to Complaint

1 #11

Exhibit 11 to Complaint

1 #9

Exhibit 9 to Complaint

1 #8

Exhibit 8 to Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit 4 to Complaint

14 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Docket(#31) MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Stay #30 by Judge James V. Selna. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion to stay the case pending the final resolution of the ITC investigation, including any and all appeals and until the Commission proceedings are no longer subject to judicial review. The parties are ordered to file a notice within fourteen days of final resolution of the ITC investigation, stating that resolution has occurred. Defendants will have thirty days from the lifting of the stay to move against, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (lom) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending ITC Proceeding filed by defendant MediaTek USA Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James D. Judah in support of Motion to Stay, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Judah, James) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#29) ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #28 by Judge James V. Selna. It is hereby ORDERED THAT: The due date for MediaTek to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter is extended to February 1, 2022. (es) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2021
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 1, 2022 filed by defendant MediaTek USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney James DuBois Judah added to party MediaTek USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Judah, James) (Entered: 12/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docket(#27) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge James V. Selna, It is hereby ORDERED THAT: The due date for Defendants to file responses to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter is extended to February 1, 2022. Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time #26 . (es) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 02/01/2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Linksys USA, Inc., Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel B. Heidtke added to party Belkin International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel B. Heidtke added to party Linksys USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Heidtke, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#24) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Vishal V. Khatri APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of NXP USA, Inc., Plaintiff, designating Steven J. Corr as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docket(#23) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Blaney Harper APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of NXP USA, Inc., Plaintiff, designating Steven J. Corr as local counsel. (es) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #17 by Judge James V. Selna. It is hereby ORDERED THAT: The due date for Amazon to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint in this matter is extended to February 1, 2022. (es) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Vishal V. Khatri. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Blaney Harper. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by NXP USA, Inc.. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32253988 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff NXP USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit 11 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 to Complaint, #13 Exhibit 13 to Complaint, #14 Exhibit 14 to Complaint, #15 Exhibit 15 to Complaint, #16 Exhibit 16 to Complaint, #17 Exhibit 17 to Complaint, #18 Exhibit 18 to Complaint, #19 Exhibit 19 to Complaint, #20 Exhibit 20 to Complaint, #21 Exhibit 21 to Complaint) (Attorney Steven John Corr added to party NXP USA, Inc.(pty:pla))(Corr, Steven) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NXP USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDIATEK USA, INC., fka Nephos Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BELKIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant