This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2023 at 09:16:46 (UTC).

Nwafor v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Nwafor filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Greyhound Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04547

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marita Nwafor

Defendants

Greyhound Lines, Inc.

Greyhound Package Express

John Doe 1

John Doe 2

ABC Company 1

ABC Company 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nasim Alizadeh

Attorney at Alizadeh Law firm

12600 Deerfield Parkway, Suite 425

Atpharetta, GA 30004

Samuel Saeed Johnson

Attorney at Samuel Johnson & Associates

12600 Deerfield Parkway, Suite 425

Alpharetta, GA 30004

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew B McClintock

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

303 Peachtree Street Ne, #4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Warner S. Fox

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP-GA

Suite 4000, 303 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Initial Disclosures by Greyhound Lines, Inc..(McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/12/2023.(McClintock, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Company 1, ABC Company 2, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, and Greyhound Lines, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Marita Nwafor. (Redocketed from #11 First Amended Complaint to create answer record.) (bgt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#11

(#11) Filed in error - redocketed at #12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Marita Nwafor.(Johnson, Samuel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/9/2023 (bgt). (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#10

(#10) First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Marita Nwafor. (Johnson, Samuel) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to File Amended Complaint by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#8

(#8) WITHDRAWAL of Claim re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal of State Law Claims by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Marita Nwafor. (Johnson, Samuel) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

6 #1

Brief

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/18/2022. (bgt) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greyhound Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FLIX SE, Other Affiliate FLIX NORTH AMERICA, INC. for Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#3

(#3) Declaration Verifying Contents by Greyhound Lines, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Declaration re Filing Removal by Greyhound Lines, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C - Case Filing Sheet (State Court)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Initial Disclosures by Greyhound Lines, Inc..(McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/12/2023.(McClintock, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #11 First Amended Complaint. Defendants were not selected as to whom the amended complaint is against during the filing process. First Amended Complaint refiled at #12 to create answer record. (bgt) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Company 1, ABC Company 2, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, and Greyhound Lines, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Marita Nwafor. (Redocketed from #11 First Amended Complaint to create answer record.) (bgt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed in error - redocketed at #12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Marita Nwafor.(Johnson, Samuel) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 1/9/2023 (bgt). (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Marita Nwafor. (Johnson, Samuel) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to File Amended Complaint by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WITHDRAWAL of Claim re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal of State Law Claims by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re Clerks Entry of Dismissal. Document filed in error. (tas) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETED IN ERROR Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #7 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (tas) Modified on 12/15/2022 (tas). (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Marita Nwafor. (Johnson, Samuel) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Partial MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(McClintock, Andrew) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- Modified on 12/15/2022 to edit event (tas). (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/18/2022. (bgt) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greyhound Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FLIX SE, Other Affiliate FLIX NORTH AMERICA, INC. for Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (McClintock, Andrew) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Declaration Verifying Contents by Greyhound Lines, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration re Filing Removal by Greyhound Lines, Inc. (nmb) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12200060) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Summons - Greyhound Lines, Inc., #3 Exhibit C - Case Filing Sheet (State Court), #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Greyhound Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant