This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:58:09 (UTC).

Nuzzo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Nuzzo filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alfonso Nuzzo

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William C. Griffin

Attorney at SESSUMS DALLAS, PLLC

240 Trace Colony Park Drive, Suite 100

Ridgeland, MS 39157-8810

Defendant Attorneys

Michael R. Moore

Attorney at BRYAN, NELSON, SCHROEDER, CASTIGLIOLA & BANAHAN, -Pascagoula

P. O. Drawer 1529, 1103 Jackson Avenue

Pascagoula, MS 39568-1529

John A. Banahan

Attorney at BRYAN, NELSON, SCHROEDER, CASTIGLIOLA & BANAHAN, -Pascagoula

P. O. Drawer 1529, 1103 Jackson Avenue

Pascagoula, MS 39568-1529

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Banahan, John) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit A First Amended Answer

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Amended Answer)(Moore, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response re #11 Response in Opposition, #7 Answer to Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Banahan, John) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#11

(#11) Response in Opposition re #7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). Plaintiff Al Nuzzo's Response to Defendant State Farm's Counterclaim for Costs filed by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#10

(#10) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***MOTION Counterclaim for Costs by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#9

(#9) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Moore on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#7

(#11) Response in Opposition re #7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). Plaintiff Al Nuzzo's Response to Defendant State Farm's Counterclaim for Costs filed by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#6

TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 5/23/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 4/15/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfonso Nuzzo. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Griffin, William) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for service upon Mississippi Commissioner of Insurance. (LAT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for service upon United States Corporation Company. (LAT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643054230), filed by Alfonso Nuzzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 7/26/2019; Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 2/6/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 7/28/2019; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 7/28/2019; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 11/6/2019; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 12/6/2019; Motions due by 2/20/2020; Settlement Conference set for 1/23/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson; ADR Report due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/2/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) First Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Banahan, John) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 6/28/2019. Participants: William Griffin and Michael Moore. A Case Management Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #13 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer. Defendant to file same on or before 7/15/2019. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/28/2019. (ACF) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A First Amended Answer)(Moore, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response re #11 Response in Opposition, #7 Answer to Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Banahan, John) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #11 : Incorrect linkage. Response should have been linked to #7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand. Court staff has made the correction. (LAT) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Response in Opposition re #7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). Plaintiff Al Nuzzo's Response to Defendant State Farm's Counterclaim for Costs filed by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #10 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as Response. Attorney will refile. (LAT) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY.***MOTION Counterclaim for Costs by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) Modified on 6/18/2019 (LAT). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Moore on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Moore, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Banahan, John) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 5/23/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 4/15/19 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Banahan, John) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alfonso Nuzzo. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Griffin, William) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alfonso Nuzzo (Griffin, William) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for service upon Mississippi Commissioner of Insurance. (LAT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for service upon United States Corporation Company. (LAT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643054230), filed by Alfonso Nuzzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Chase Griffis