This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:58:18 (UTC).

Nutramax Laboratories, Inc. et al v. Honest Paws L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Nutramax Laboratories, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Honest Paws L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy F Atlas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02566

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy F Atlas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nutramax Laboratories, Inc.

Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.

Defendants

Erik Rivera

Honest Paws L.L.C.

Altva Holdings LLC

Altva Inc.

SimpleWag

CloudClinic, LLC d/b/a CertaPet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew William Cornelia

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Ste 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Lucy Jewett Wheatley

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

800 East Canal St

Richmond, VA 23219

Brad R Newberg

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1750 Tysons Boulevard, Ste. 1800

Tysons, VA 22102

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas W Sankey

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

1330 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77056-3166

Cameron J. Asby

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1330 Post Oak Blvd, Ste 800

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Brad R. Newberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for All Defendants on or before October 22, 2019(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron J. Asby on behalf of Altva Holdings LLC, Altva Inc., CloudClinic, LLC d/b/a CertaPet, Erik Rivera, Honest Paws L.L.C., filed. (Asby, Cameron) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Altva Holdings LLC, Altva Inc., CloudClinic, LLC d/b/a CertaPet, Erik Rivera, Honest Paws L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sankey, Thomas) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to CloudClinic, LLC d/b/a CertaPet served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019, filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Honest Paws L.L.C. served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019, filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued as to Altva Holdings LLC, Altva Inc., CloudClinic, LLC d/b/a CertaPet, Erik Rivera, Honest Paws L.L.C., SimpleWag. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Lucy Jewett Wheatley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Brad R. Newberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2019. (Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Lucy Jewett Wheatley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019. (Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Issuance of Summons as to SimpleWag, filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Altva Holdings LLC, Altva Inc., filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified. (hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Erik Rivera, filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to CloudClinic, LLC d/b/a CertaPet, filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Honest Paws L.L.C., filed.(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Altva Holdings LLC, Altva Inc., CloudClinic, LLC d/b/a CertaPet, Erik Rivera, Honest Paws L.L.C., SimpleWag (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22797380) filed by Nutramax Laboratories, Inc., Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - SimpleWag CA Filing, #3 Exhibit 2 - TM Registrations, #4 Exhibit 3 - Honest Paws Article, #5 Exhibit 4 - Honest Paws CBD Oil, #6 Exhibit 5 - SimpleWag Article, #7 Exhibit 6 - CertaPet Joint Suppl Article, #8 Exhibit 7 - CertaPet Dasuquin Article, #9 Exhibit 8 - CertaPet CBD Oil Article, #10 Exhibit 9 - Altva Portfolio, #11 Exhibit 10 - Altva Team, #12 Exhibit 11 - CA SOS Stmt CloudClinic, #13 Exhibit 12 - CertaPet Privacy Policy)(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nutramax Laboratories Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Nutramax Laboratories Veterinary Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad R. Newberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucy J Wheatley