This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:19:39 (UTC).

Nunn v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Nunn filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Ray, II and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05492

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William M. Ray, II

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lauren Denise Nunn

Defendants

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard D. Olinsky

Attorney at Olinsky Law Group

300 S. State Street, Suite 420

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall therefore proceed as any other civil action. the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED TO FORWARD sufficient USM 285 Forms to Plaintiffs counsel. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the forms and return them to the Clerk within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this Order, so that process may be served upon Defendant. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshals Service service packages for Defendant. The service packages must include the USM 285 form, the summons, and one (1) copy of the complaint. Upon receipt of the service packages, the U.S. Marshals Service is DIRECTED to serve Defendant. The completed USM 285 forms shall be filed with the Clerk. The Clerk is DIRECTED also to ISSUE electronic summonses to Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/9/19. (rlb) Modified on 12/10/2019 to edit judge association (rlb). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (tcc) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S Notification of Reassignment to US Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Standing Order 07-02 re: Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-CV-5492-AJB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rlb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Lauren Denise Nunn. (Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney - NDGA, #2 U.S. Attorney General, #3 USM - 285 Form)(rlb) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT filed by Lauren Denise Nunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall therefore proceed as any other civil action. the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED TO FORWARD sufficient USM 285 Forms to Plaintiffs counsel. Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the forms and return them to the Clerk within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this Order, so that process may be served upon Defendant. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshals Service service packages for Defendant. The service packages must include the USM 285 form, the summons, and one (1) copy of the complaint. Upon receipt of the service packages, the U.S. Marshals Service is DIRECTED to serve Defendant. The completed USM 285 forms shall be filed with the Clerk. The Clerk is DIRECTED also to ISSUE electronic summonses to Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/9/19. (rlb) Modified on 12/10/2019 to edit judge association (rlb). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (ah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Lauren Denise Nunn. (ah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lauren Denise Nunn. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Summons Proposed, #5 Summons Proposed, #6 Summons Proposed, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less