This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:18:52 (UTC).

Nunez v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Nunez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00600

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel G. Nunez

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teresa M Meagher

14 Corporate Woods, 8717 W. 110Th St., Suite 440

Overland Park, KS 66210

Defendant Attorney

OGCSSAR7

Attorney at Office of General Counsel-SSA Region 7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Teresa M Meagher on behalf of Daniel G. Nunez. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMOWDC-6967898) Service due by 10/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meagher, Teresa) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less