This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 07:43:42 (UTC).

Nunez v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Nunez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against New Mexico Corrections Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and Kenneth J. Gonzales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judge

Kenneth J. Gonzales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Nunez

Roswell, NM 88201

Defendants

Correctional Properties Trust

Jane Doe

Gregg Marcantel

John Doe

New Mexico Corrections Department

Rose Bobchack

David Jablonski

GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC

Raymond Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dwight E. Thompson

Attorney at Dwight E. Thompson Law Office, P.C.

4610 South Ulster Street, Suite 150

Denver, CO 80237

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Shanor

Attorney at Hinkle, Hensley, Shanor & Martin, LLP

Po Box 10

Roswell, NM 88202-0010

Chelsea Rae Green

Attorney at Hinkle, Hensley, Shanor & Martin, LLP

Post Office Box 10

Roswell, NM 88202

Alyssa Dawn Rogers

Attorney at Hinkle Shanor, LLP

Post Office Box 10

Roswell, NM 88202-0010

Michael S. Jahner

Attorney at YLAW, P.C.

4908 Alameda Blvd. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87113-1736

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico Corrections Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Mexico Corrections Department (Green, Chelsea) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #16 Response to Motion (NMCD Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter/Motion to Appoint Counsel) (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #5 MOTION to Stay (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#17

(#17) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC. (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Shanor, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Consent) (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

14 #19

Exhibit S

14 #18

Exhibit R

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwight E. Thompson terminated. The Clerk is directed to send copies of all of the documents that have been filed with the Court, including this order, and a pro se packet to Mr. Andrew Nunez. (cda) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#7

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwight E. Thompson terminated. The Clerk is directed to send copies of all of the documents that have been filed with the Court, including this order, and a pro se packet to Mr. Andrew Nunez. (cda) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by New Mexico Corrections Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Shanor, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#5

(#11) FILED IN ERROR****ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #5 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings, including all discovery, pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah) Modified on 2/5/2019 (yc). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#4

(#20) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico Corrections Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Mexico Corrections Department (Green, Chelsea) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/27/2019. (pv) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#15) NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Consent) (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Briefing Complete by New Mexico Corrections Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by New Mexico Corrections Department (Green, Chelsea) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #16 Response to Motion (NMCD Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter/Motion to Appoint Counsel) (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #5 MOTION to Stay (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC. (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Shanor, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE by GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Consent) (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Transmittal of State Court Documents by New Mexico Corrections Department (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y) (Shanor, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#12) ORDER TO VACATE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque is VACATED and will be reset at a later date, if necessary. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FILED IN ERROR****ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #5 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings, including all discovery, pending resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (tah) Modified on 2/5/2019 (yc). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by New Mexico Corrections Department of Plaintiff's Opposition to the NMCD Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings (Shanor, Stephen) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwight E. Thompson terminated. The Clerk is directed to send copies of all of the documents that have been filed with the Court, including this order, and a pro se packet to Mr. Andrew Nunez. (cda) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrew Nunez. (Thompson, Dwight) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by New Mexico Corrections Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Shanor, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Stay by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Shanor, Stephen) Modified to unterm motion on 2/5/2019 (yc). (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Shanor, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/3/2019 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/27/2019. (pv) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • (#2) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB042498 (mnb)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Mexico Corrections Department and David Jablonski from 5th Judicial District - Chaves County, case number d-504-cv-2017-00968. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Green, Chelsea) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.