This case was last updated from PACER on 01/28/2020 at 07:16:32 (UTC).

Nunez v. Kemp et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2019 Nunez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kemp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark H. Cohen and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05428

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Khalid Nunez

Jackson, GA 30233

Defendants

Shawn Ellen LaGrua

Kevin T. McMurry

Andre T. Lowe, II

Governor Brian P. Kemp

Herbert Adams, Jr.

Paul L. Howard, Jr.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Khalid Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A (b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (bjh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#4

(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/12/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER Granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall be obligated to pay the full statutory filing fee of $350.00 as funds are deposited in his inmate account. The Clerk of Court transmit a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Prison in Jackson, Georgia. The Warden, or his designee, shall collect the aforesaid monthly payments from Plaintiff's inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full and Service of process shall not issue pending further consideration of the complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/6/19. c:Financial Office(bjh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/12/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER Adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk is Directed to Close this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/31/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • Filing Fee Paid: $ 6.00, receipt number 118473. (rjs) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (bjh) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Khalid Nunez re #7 Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (bjh) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A (b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (bjh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk is Directed to Close this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/31/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Khalid Nunez re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.(bjh) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/12/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint. IT IS RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/12/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Khalid Nunez and Warden re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (bjh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall be obligated to pay the full statutory filing fee of $350.00 as funds are deposited in his inmate account. The Clerk of Court transmit a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Prison in Jackson, Georgia. The Warden, or his designee, shall collect the aforesaid monthly payments from Plaintiff's inmate account and remit such payments to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full and Service of process shall not issue pending further consideration of the complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/6/19. c:Financial Office(bjh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Khalid Nunez. (eop) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Khalid Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.