This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2023 at 07:08:50 (UTC).

Nunes v. Cable News Network, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2022 Nunes filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Cable News Network, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan C. Bucklew and Anthony E. Porcelli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02659

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan C. Bucklew

Referral Judge

Anthony E. Porcelli

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devin G. Nunes

Defendants

Cable News Network, Inc.

Jake Tapper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason R. Kobal

Attorney at Kobal Law, P.A.

12169 W Linebaugh Ave

Tampa, FL 33626-1732

Steven S. Biss

Attorney at Law Office of Steven S. Biss

300 West Main Street, Suite 102

Charlottesville, VA 22903

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. (CAB) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Devin G. Nunes. (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason R. Kobal on behalf of Devin G. Nunes. Lead Counsel: Stephen Biss. (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of counsel re #7 Notice of Lead Counsel Designation and disclosure of interested parties by Jason R. Kobal on behalf of Devin G. Nunes (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS issued as to Cable News Network, Inc. (MCB) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/06/2022 by Devin G. Nunes as to Cable News Network, Inc., Jake Tapper. (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER of service returned executed on 12/06/2022 by Devin G. Nunes as to Cable News Network, Inc., Jake Tapper. (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS issued as to Cable News Network, Inc. (MCB) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of counsel re #7 Notice of Lead Counsel Designation and disclosure of interested parties by Jason R. Kobal on behalf of Devin G. Nunes (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason R. Kobal on behalf of Devin G. Nunes. Lead Counsel: Stephen Biss. (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Devin G. Nunes. (Kobal, Jason) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to counsel Steven S. Biss Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to plaintiff counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. (CAB) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:22-cv-2659-SCB-AEP. (SJB) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20220721) filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kobal, Jason) Modified text on 11/21/2022 (KME). (Entered: 11/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less