This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 08:00:36 (UTC).

Nunes v. Cable News Network, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Nunes filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Cable News Network, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00889

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devin G. Nunes

Defendant

Cable News Network, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Scott Biss

300 West Main St, Ste 102

Charlottesville, VA 22903

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Fuzesi

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Kevin T. Baine

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Dane Hal Butswinkas

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Kevin T. Baine to appear Pro hac vice for Cable News Network, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/22/20. (jsau, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

16 #4

Exhibit D

16 #3

Exhibit C

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

15 #3

Exhibit C

#15

(#15) Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

14 #6

Proposed Order

14 #5

Exhibit D

14 #4

Exhibit C

14 #3

Exhibit B

14 #2

Exhibit A

14 #1

Memorandum of Law

#14

(#14) MOTION to Transfer Case by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

13 #1

Memorandum of Law

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#12

(#12) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin T. Baine and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7031158. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Kevin T. Baine to appear Pro hac vice for Cable News Network, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/22/20. (jsau, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Filing attorney notified of correct procedures when filing a Motion and Memorandum in Support. Attorney directed to re-file the Memorandum for each motion and link each document back to the correct Motion. (jsau, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Transfer Case by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin T. Baine and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7031158. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Stephen Fuzesi to appear Pro hac vice for Cable News Network, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/30/19. (jsau, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND #9 is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by January 17, 2020. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/20/19. (jsau, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Cable News Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Butswinkas, Dane) Modified docket text on 12/19/2019 (jsau, ). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen J. Fuzesi and Certification of Local Counsel Emily Rose Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6992082. by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Hal Butswinkas on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc. (Butswinkas, Dane) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devin G. Nunes Cable News Network, Inc. served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019 (Biss, Steven) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Cable News Network, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Devin G. Nunes. (Biss, Steven) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6966149.), filed by Devin G. Nunes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Biss, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2019) (tjoh, ). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.