This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2023 at 08:48:11 (UTC).

Nuanes v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 Nuanes filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Blackburn and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Blackburn

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bernadette Nuanes

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Krivit

Attorney at Krivit Law

44 Cook Street, Suite 100

Denver, CO 80206

Defendant Attorney

Heather A. Salg

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

6465 Greenwood Plaza Boulevard, Suite 650

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 February 2023. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#14

(#14) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2023. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#13

(#13) SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT Amended Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

#11

(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David W. Krivit on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David W. Krivit added to party Bernadette Nuanes(pty:pla) (Krivit, David) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#9

(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 January 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due2/16/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2023 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Bernadette Nuanes.(norlin, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

1 #9

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G - Return of Service

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F - Register of Actions

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Notice

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 February 2023. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2023. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT Amended Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automible Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David W. Krivit on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David W. Krivit added to party Bernadette Nuanes(pty:pla) (Krivit, David) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 January 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due2/16/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2023 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/6/2023. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Bernadette Nuanes.(norlin, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company from Adams County, Case Number 2022CV31554. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8868536), filed by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - District Court Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Articles of Incorporation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Register of Actions, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Return of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less