This case was last updated from PACER on 07/21/2019 at 07:10:53 (UTC).

NS International Textiles v. Amazon.com Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 NS International Textiles filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Amazon com Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04463

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES

Defendants

AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.

Does inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chan Yong Jeong

Attorney at Jeong and Likens LC

222 South Oxford Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory L Doll

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jamie Olivia Kendall

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. answer now due 7/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc..(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. answer now due 7/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc..(Attorney Jamie Olivia Kendall added to party Amazon.com Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NS International Textiles, upon Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Cassidy, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES, (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A-C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23788098 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. answer now due 7/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc..(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. answer now due 7/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc..(Attorney Jamie Olivia Kendall added to party Amazon.com Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff NS International Textiles, upon Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Cassidy, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amazon.com Services, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES, (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23788098 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C) (Attorney Chan Yong Jeong added to party NS INTERNATIONAL TEXTILES(pty:pla))(Jeong, Chan) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NS Int'l Textiles is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory L Doll

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie Olivia Kendall