This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2020 at 12:20:27 (UTC).

NRI ATM, LLC v. Plant Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 NRI ATM, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Plant Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NRI ATM, LLC

Defendants

Plant Services, Inc.

Metal Works, Inc.

Alvin Bell

Ruben Reynoso

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cameron James Asby

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Houston

1330 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77056

Gregory S. Bombard

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP - Boston

100 High Street, Suite 2400

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory S. Bombard on behalf of NRI ATM, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7826750 paid on 06/08/2020. (fal, ) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued and emailed to plaintiff's attorney for service as to Alvin Bell, Metal Works, Inc., Plant Services, Inc., Ruben Reynoso. (bjc, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel as to Ruben Reynoso. (bmf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel as to Plant Services, Inc. (bmf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel as to Alvin Bell. (bmf) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel as to Metal Works, Inc.(bmf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Cameron James Asby on behalf of NRI ATM, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7826750. (Asby, Cameron) Modified on 6/16/2020 (fal, ). (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (fal, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (fal, ) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7823976.), filed by NRI ATM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Asby, Cameron) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metal Works, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory S. Bombard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron J. Asby