This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2020 at 09:36:04 (UTC).

NP Parc Chateaux, LLC v. Moshe Perry et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 NP Parc Chateaux, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Moshe Perry. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01207

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

NP Parc Chateaux, LLC

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Does 1 to 10 inclusive

Moshe Michael A. Perry

West Hills, CA 91307

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Tania Kim Cardoso

Attorney at Hollenbeck and Cardoso LLP

7755 Center Avenue, Suite 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55298 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #13 as to defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jp) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

15 #1

Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Moshe Perry

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to The Notice of Appeal item #13 was filed as to the incorrect party. The notice of appeal was filed by the defendant Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Moshe Perry) (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: denying #12 EX PARTE APPLICATION and Affidavit for Extension of Time to File Appeal. (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: denying #11 Request to Proceed Appeal In Forma Pauperis; denying #17 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

17 #1

Lodged Proposed Order

#13

(#13) [See Notice of Clerical Error item 15.] NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Michael [Moshe] Perry. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #7 Filed On: 2/18/20; Entered On: 2/19/20; In forma pauperis is pending. (mat) Modified on 3/16/2020 (mat). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

12 #1

Lodged Proposed Order

#12

(#12) EX PARTE APPLICATION and Declaration for Extension of Time to File Appeal, filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (mat) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#7

(#13) [See Notice of Clerical Error item 15.] NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Michael [Moshe] Perry. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #7 Filed On: 2/18/20; Entered On: 2/19/20; In forma pauperis is pending. (mat) Modified on 3/16/2020 (mat). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#4

(#7) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #4 . FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (esa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (esa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #2

CV71

1 #1

State Court File

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, case number 20XHUD00033 with copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #1 State Court File, #2 CV71) (esa). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/11/2020) (lmh). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55298 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #13 as to defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jp) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to The Notice of Appeal item #13 was filed as to the incorrect party. The notice of appeal was filed by the defendant Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Moshe Perry) (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: denying #12 EX PARTE APPLICATION and Affidavit for Extension of Time to File Appeal. (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: denying #11 Request to Proceed Appeal In Forma Pauperis; denying #17 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPELLANT APPLICATION from the Ninth Circuit for an Emergency Judicial Stay re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #13 . (mat) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION to Reopen Case, for Emergency Stay, and to Quash Writ of Execution and Writ of Possession #10 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) [See Notice of Clerical Error item 15.] NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendant Michael [Moshe] Perry. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #7 Filed On: 2/18/20; Entered On: 2/19/20; In forma pauperis is pending. (mat) Modified on 3/16/2020 (mat). (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EX PARTE APPLICATION and Declaration for Extension of Time to File Appeal, filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (mat) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST TO PROCEED In Forma Pauperis With Declaration in Support to Appeal, filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (mat) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer DENYING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #4 . FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 forwarded to District Judge Dale S. Fischer for review.(clee) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (esa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (esa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (esa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF CROSS-COMPLAINT against Counter Defendant NP Parc Chateaux, LLC; jury demand, filed by cross-complainant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (see p. 51 of state court file) (esa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Moshe Michael A. Perry, filed by plaintiff NP Parc Chateaux, LLC. (see p. 10 of State court file) (esa) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, case number 20XHUD00033 with copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, filed by defendant Moshe Michael A. Perry. (esa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2020: #1 State Court File, #2 CV71) (esa). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/11/2020) (lmh). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NP Parc Chateaux, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tania Kim Cardoso