This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:14:04 (UTC).

Nozawa v. Cypress Semiconductor Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Nozawa filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06821

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hiroyuki Nozawa

Defendants

W. Steve Albrecht

Hassane El-Khoury

Jeannine Sargent

Catherine P. Lego

Michael S. Wishart

Jeffrey J. Owens

Cypress Semiconductor Corporation

Oh Chul Kwon

Camillo Martino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua M. Lifshitz

Attorney at Lifshitz & Miller

821 Franklin Ave

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. By the date of the pretrial conference counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court, at the time and place listed below. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 conference, and to prepare a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. Prior to the date of the conference, all parties must send the Court one copy of all pleadings. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: OCTOBER 4, 2019 AT 11:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 188 AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, 10007. (Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/12/19) (yv) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-6369. Document filed by Hiroyuki Nozawa.(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lifshitz, Joshua) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against W. Steve Albrecht, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Hassane El-Khoury, Oh Chul Kwon, Catherine P. Lego, Camillo Martino, Jeffrey J. Owens, Jeannine Sargent, Michael S. Wishart. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17294548)Document filed by Hiroyuki Nozawa.(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. By the date of the pretrial conference counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court, at the time and place listed below. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 conference, and to prepare a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. Prior to the date of the conference, all parties must send the Court one copy of all pleadings. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: OCTOBER 4, 2019 AT 11:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 188 AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, 10007. (Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/12/19) (yv) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-06369-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 19-cv-6369. (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Hiroyuki Nozawa. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua M. Lifshitz to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Judge's name and case number for the related case was omitted on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-6369. Document filed by Hiroyuki Nozawa.(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lifshitz, Joshua) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against W. Steve Albrecht, Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, Hassane El-Khoury, Oh Chul Kwon, Catherine P. Lego, Camillo Martino, Jeffrey J. Owens, Jeannine Sargent, Michael S. Wishart. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17294548)Document filed by Hiroyuki Nozawa.(Lifshitz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cypress Semiconductor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua M. Lifshitz