This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 08:15:34 (UTC).

Noyola v. Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Noyola filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jane J Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00107

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane J Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Noyola

Defendant

Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Leonard Bauguss, III

Attorney at Ben Abbott & Associates PLLC

1934 Pendleton Drive

Garland, TX 75041

Defendant Attorneys

William Marcus Toles

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.

500 N. Akard Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

Isabelle L Hutchinson

Attorney at Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr PC

3800 Ross Tower, 500 N Akard Street

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13441827) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Toles, William) Modified text on 1/17/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/13/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Index

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 1

1 #3

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #4

Exhibit(s) 3

1 #5

Exhibit(s) 4

1 #6

Exhibit(s) 5

1 #7

Cover Sheet

1 #8

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Toles, William) Modified text on 1/17/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#4

(#4) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/14/2023. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/24/2023) (svc) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. (Hutchinson, Isabelle) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial beginning 3/18/2024 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 6/22/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2023. Motions due by 12/19/2023. Discovery due by 11/20/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/20/2023. Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 3/4/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/15/2023) (svc) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maria Noyola. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bauguss, James) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maria Noyola. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bauguss, James) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial beginning 3/18/2024 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 6/22/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2023. Motions due by 12/19/2023. Discovery due by 11/20/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/20/2023. Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 3/4/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/15/2023) (svc) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. (Hutchinson, Isabelle) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/14/2023. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 1/24/2023) (svc) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Toles, William) Modified text on 1/17/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Sprouts Farmers Market Texas LP. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13441827) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Toles, William) Modified text on 1/17/2023 (mms). (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less