This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:55:48 (UTC).

Novo Nordisk Inc. et al v. Zydus Worldwide DMCC et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Novo Nordisk Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zydus Worldwide DMCC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Novo Nordisk Inc.

Novo Nordisk A/S

Defendants

Zydus Worldwide DMCC

Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.

Cadila Healthcare Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3817668.) - filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 02/01/2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: U.S. Patent No. 9,132,239 expires 2/1/2032 and U.S. Patent No. 10,335,462 expires on 6/21/2033.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 6/5/2025. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,132,239 B2 ;10,335,462 B2. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novo A/S and Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk US Holdings, Inc. for Novo Nordisk Inc.; Corporate Parent Novo A/S for Novo Nordisk A/S - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S and Novo Nordisk Inc. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Zydus Worldwide DMCC on 3/4/2022. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 3/4/2022. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Cadila Healthcare Ltd. on 3/4/2022. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S: For Cadila Healthcare Ltd. waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S: For Zydus Worldwide DMCC waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S: For Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Ltd. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint to May 9, 2022 - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Ltd. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint to May 9, 2022, filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/14/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. and Cadila Healthcare Ltd. to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint to May 9, 2022 - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S: For Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S: For Zydus Worldwide DMCC waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S: For Cadila Healthcare Ltd. waiver sent on 3/10/2022, answer due 5/9/2022. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00294-CFC through 1:22-cv-00299-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Cadila Healthcare Ltd. on 3/4/2022. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. on 3/4/2022. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Zydus Worldwide DMCC on 3/4/2022. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novo A/S and Corporate Parent Novo Nordisk US Holdings, Inc. for Novo Nordisk Inc.; Corporate Parent Novo A/S for Novo Nordisk A/S - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S and Novo Nordisk Inc. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,132,239 B2 ;10,335,462 B2. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 02/01/2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: U.S. Patent No. 9,132,239 expires 2/1/2032 and U.S. Patent No. 10,335,462 expires on 6/21/2033.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 6/5/2025. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Cadila Healthcare Ltd., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3817668.) - filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVO NORDISK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cadila Healthcare Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P. Egan