This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2022 at 07:09:52 (UTC).

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation et al v. Accord Healthcare Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Accord Healthcare Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00744

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.

Defendants

Accord Healthcare Inc.

Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,973,031. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 4/26/2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: 10/9/2028.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/28/2024. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Summons Issued Intas

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare Inc. on 6/6/2022; Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. on 6/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Intas)(apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 4/26/2022. Date of Expiration of Patent: 10/9/2028.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 10/28/2024. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,973,031. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Accord Healthcare Inc., Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3889839.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Intas Pharmaceuticals Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Accord Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sandoz Inc. is a litigant