This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/01/2019 at 07:13:07 (UTC).

Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC v. Kirkland et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kirkland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11469

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC

Defendants

Interscope Records, Inc.

Jonathan Kirkland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher L. Brown

Attorney at Brown & Rosen LLC

100 State Street, 9Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Jonathan Kirkland served on 8/17/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC. (Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC. (Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7765753 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Nothing To Something Entertaintment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERSCOPE RECORDS A DIVISON OF UMG RECORDINGS INC AND TRAP ILLUSTRATED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher L. Brown