This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:32:02 (UTC).

Nosseir et al v. Pompeo et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Nosseir filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Pompeo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are James A. Parker and Laura Fashing. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00557

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A. Parker

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mostafa Nosseir

Gabriel Nosseir

Defendants

Mike Pompeo

USA

FBI

US Department of State

Christopher A. Wray

William P Barr

Federal Bureau of Investigations

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Olsi Vrapi

Attorney at Noble & Vrapi PA

5931 Jefferson St. Ne, Suite A

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Amber Lea Weeks

Attorney at Noble & Vrapi, P.A.

5931 Jefferson St. Ne, Suite A

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant Attorney

Tiffany L Walters

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Walters on behalf of United States of America (Walters, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#5

(#5) "FILED IN ERROR" missing certified return receipt. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. (Weeks, Amber) Modified on 7/22/2019 (bap). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#4

(#4) "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. Mike Pompeo served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; US Department of State served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Weeks, Amber) Modified on 7/22/2019 (bap). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Lea Weeks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weeks, Amber) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

(#2) "FILED IN ERROR" will refile separately . SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. All Defendants. (Vrapi, Olsi) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (bap). (Entered: 07/07/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Gabriel Nosseir, Mostafa Nosseir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Vrapi, Olsi) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Walters on behalf of United States of America (Walters, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Summons Issued as to The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser. (ln) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) "FILED IN ERROR" missing certified return receipt. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. (Weeks, Amber) Modified on 7/22/2019 (bap). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) "FILED IN ERROR" SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. Mike Pompeo served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; US Department of State served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Weeks, Amber) Modified on 7/22/2019 (bap). (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Lea Weeks on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weeks, Amber) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) "FILED IN ERROR" will refile separately . SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir. All Defendants. (Vrapi, Olsi) Modified text on 7/8/2019 (bap). (Entered: 07/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Mike Pompeo, US Department of State, United States of America, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney (jg) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • United States District Judge James A. Parker and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6485828 re #1 Complaint, filed by Mostafa Nosseir, Gabriel Nosseir (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vrapi, Olsi) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Gabriel Nosseir, Mostafa Nosseir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Vrapi, Olsi) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.