This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2020 at 08:41:37 (UTC).

Noskenda Inc v. Valley Forge Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Noskenda Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Valley Forge Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00854

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Noskenda Inc

Defendant

Valley Forge Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maureen M Falecki

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Nathan L Nanfelt

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Mark A Wilner

Attorney at GORDON TILDEN THOMAS & CORDELL LLP

600 University Street, Ste 2915

Seattle, WA 98101

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Irene Margret Hecht

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Ian S Birk

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Lynn Lincoln Sarko

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Amy C Williams-Derry

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel H Levi

Attorney at PAUL WEISS RIFKIND WHARTON & GARRISON

1285 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 20019-6064

H Christopher Boehning

Attorney at PAUL WEISS RIFKIND WHARTON & GARRISON (NY)

1285 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Anthony Todaro

Attorney at DLA PIPER US LLP (WA)

701 Fifth Ave, Ste 6900

Seattle, WA 98104-7044

Hallie S Goldblatt

Attorney at PAUL WEISS RIFKIND WHARTON & GARRISON (NY)

1285 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Elizabeth M Sacksteder

Attorney at PAUL WEISS RIFKIND WHARTON & GARRISON (NY)

1285 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#13

(#13) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Hallie S. Goldblatt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455806 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#12

(#12) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel H. Levi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455790 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#11

(#11) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth M. Sacksteder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455779 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#10

(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY H. Christopher Boehning FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455762 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Noskenda Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams-Derry, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA), Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Valley Forge Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Valley Forge Insurance Company on 6/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Noskenda Inc. (Williams-Derry, Amy) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings as related to C20-809BJR. All further pleadings should reflect case number C20-854BJR. Judge Marsha J. Pechman no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Noskenda Inc (Birk, Ian) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Valley Forge Insurance Company. (RE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Valley Forge Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6381003), filed by Noskenda Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Birk, Ian) (Attachment 1 was replaced on 6/5/2020 due to numerous copies of the same civil cover sheet being filed) (RE). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Hallie S Goldblatt for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel H Levi for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elizabeth M Sacksteder for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney H Christopher Boehning for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Hallie S. Goldblatt FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455806 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel H. Levi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455790 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth M. Sacksteder FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455779 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY H. Christopher Boehning FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6455762 (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Noskenda Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams-Derry, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company (CNA), Other Affiliate The Continental Corporation for Valley Forge Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Valley Forge Insurance Company (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Valley Forge Insurance Company on 6/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Noskenda Inc. (Williams-Derry, Amy) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings as related to C20-809BJR. All further pleadings should reflect case number C20-854BJR. Judge Marsha J. Pechman no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Noskenda Inc (Birk, Ian) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Valley Forge Insurance Company. (RE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Noskenda Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/12/2020. (RE) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Valley Forge Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6381003), filed by Noskenda Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Birk, Ian) (Attachment 1 was replaced on 6/5/2020 due to numerous copies of the same civil cover sheet being filed) (RE). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less