This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:22:32 (UTC).

Norton v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Norton filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin L.C. Feldman and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09307

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Norton

Defendants

Nancy A Berryhill

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melanie Anne Leavitt

Attorney at Melanie A. Leavitt, Attorney at Law

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 303

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: Return receipts indicating service of summonses have now been filed in the record. Record Doc. No. #5 . Accordingly, the call docket scheduled for today is SATISFIED, and no appearances are necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/10/2019.(mmv) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: You are hereby notified that the captioned case will be called on 7/10/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Counsel for plaintiff must appear IN PERSON and report on the status of the case and show cause why service of the summons and complaint has not been completed. If service is completed before 7/10/2019, filing the appropriate service returns in the record will satisfy this order and make an appearance unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/18/2019.(ajn) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney added incorrect services dates. Clerk took corrective action to reset the dates as follows: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (sa) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: Return receipts indicating service of summonses have now been filed in the record. Record Doc. No. #5 . Accordingly, the call docket scheduled for today is SATISFIED, and no appearances are necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/10/2019.(mmv) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Social Security Administration served on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meunier, Adam) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (sa). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: You are hereby notified that the captioned case will be called on 7/10/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Counsel for plaintiff must appear IN PERSON and report on the status of the case and show cause why service of the summons and complaint has not been completed. If service is completed before 7/10/2019, filing the appropriate service returns in the record will satisfy this order and make an appearance unnecessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/18/2019.(ajn) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(clc) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (djg) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7564159) filed by Catherine Norton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Melanie Anne Leavitt added to party Catherine Norton(pty:pla).(Leavitt, Melanie) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (clc). (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less