This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2022 at 03:56:46 (UTC).

NORTHWEST FLORIDA INVESTMENTS INC v. BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 NORTHWEST FLORIDA INVESTMENTS INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and HOPE T CANNON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

HOPE T CANNON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Northwest FLorida Investments, Inc. d/b/a Exit Realty NFI

NORTHWEST FLORIDA INVESTMENTS INC doing business as EXIT REALTY NFI

Defendant

BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT SCOTT ELSINGER

Attorney at THE MINEO SALCEDO LAW FIRM PA - DAVIE FL

5400 South University Drive, Suite 502

Davie, FL 33328

Defendant Attorneys

GABRIELLE R MERCADANTE

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE LLP - MIAMI FL

777 Brickell Avenue, Suite 680

Miami, FL 33131

EUGENE P MURPHY

Attorney at ROBINSON & COLE LLP - MIAMI FL

777 Brickell Avenue, Suite 680

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (MURPHY, EUGENE) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 9/19/2021). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/10/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. (jcw) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MURPHY, EUGENE) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. ( Discovery due by 8/12/2022., Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 9/2/2022., Mediation Report due by 9/23/2022.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/8/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jcw) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MURPHY, EUGENE) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by NORTHWEST FLORIDA INVESTMENTS INC. (ELSINGER, GARRETT) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Blackboard US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Ranae L Stewart, Other Affiliate Ranae L. Stewart, Trustee of the Renae L. Stewart Trust dated Oct. 16, 2015 VTS for BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MURPHY, EUGENE) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. (Response to complaint due by 9/9/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/25/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OFTIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. (jcw) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (MURPHY, EUGENE) Modified on 8/25/2021 to edit title (jcw). (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/3/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2021. Discovery due by 2/21/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/20/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (See proposed ISO). (jcw) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GARRETT SCOTT ELSINGER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ELSINGER, GARRETT) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines - Clerk to check status of #3 Notice of Attorney Admission on 9/20/2021. (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to PETER MINEO, JR., Esq. and JOHN A. SALCEDO, Esq. on behalf of NORTHWEST FLORIDA INVESTMENTS INC. (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names, including aliases, are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY from First Judicial Court, case number 2021-CA-001657. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6252600.), filed by BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, EUGENE) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Garrett Scott Elsinger