This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 07:12:13 (UTC).

Northwest Administrators Inc v. National Convention Services LLC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Northwest Administrators Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against National Convention Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jamal N Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00252

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jamal N Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Administrators Inc

Defendant

National Convention Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell J Reid

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) National Convention Services LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7902381), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant National Convention Services LLC (CR) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/1/2023. (TKL) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) National Convention Services LLC filed by Northwest Administrators Inc.(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on National Convention Services LLC on 3/30/2023, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Default against National Convention Services LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order of Default) Noting Date 4/21/2023, (Holland, John) (Reid, Russell) Modified on 4/21/2023 per filer request, corrected filing attorney name (STP). (Entered: 04/21/2023)

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #2

Proposed Order of Default

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 MOTION for Default against National Convention Services LLC: per filer request, corrected filing attorney name to Russell Reid. (STP) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Default against National Convention Services LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order of Default) Noting Date 4/21/2023, (Holland, John) (Reid, Russell) Modified on 4/21/2023 per filer request, corrected filing attorney name (STP). (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on National Convention Services LLC on 3/30/2023, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Jamal N Whitehead. Judge Thomas S. Zilly no longer assigned to the case. (LC) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) National Convention Services LLC filed by Northwest Administrators Inc.(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Thomas S. Zilly: Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/17/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/1/2023. (TKL) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant National Convention Services LLC (CR) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketJudge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CR) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) National Convention Services LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7902381), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less