This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 11:41:12 (UTC).

Northwest Administrators Inc v. Mondelez Global LLC

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Northwest Administrators Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Mondelez Global LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is James L. Robart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01309

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Administrators Inc

Defendant

Mondelez Global LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell J Reid

Attorney at REID, McCARTHY, BALLEW & LEAHY, LLP

100 West Harrison Street

North Tower, SU 300

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mondelez Global LLC (SG) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#4

(#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Mondelez Global LLC on 10/5/2021 (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Mondelez Global LLC on 10/5/2021 (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mondelez Global LLC (SG) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketJudge James L. Robart added. (SG) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Mondelez Global LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7266352), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mondelez Global LLC Group Benefits Plan. the is a litigant

Latest cases where Northwest Administrators, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell J Reid