This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2023 at 02:46:04 (UTC).

Northwest Administrators Inc v. Kuehne & Nagel Inc

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Northwest Administrators Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Kuehne Nagel Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John C. Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John C. Coughenour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Administrators Inc

Defendant

Kuehne & Nagel Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell J Reid

Defendant Attorney

Russell Scott Buhite

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT to Compel Audit against defendant(s) Kuehne & Nagel Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7871379) Attorney Russell J Reid added to party Northwest Administrators Inc(pty:pla), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc (CR) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Russell Scott Buhite on behalf of Defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc. (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#6

(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/14/2023, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER re Parties' #6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Kuehne shall file its responsive pleading no later than 3/20/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kuehne & Nagel Inc on 2/7/2023, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated), filed by Defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/9/2023, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive Brief is due by 4/20/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/28/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/5/2023, and the Joint Status Report is due by 5/12/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Answer and Initial Case Management Dates, filed by Defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/16/2023, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated), filed by Defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/9/2023, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kuehne & Nagel Inc on 2/7/2023, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/30/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/6/2023, Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2023. (KMP) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re Parties' #6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Kuehne shall file its responsive pleading no later than 3/20/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SS) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, , filed by Defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/14/2023, (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Russell Scott Buhite on behalf of Defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc. (Buhite, Russell) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Kuehne & Nagel Inc (CR) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CR) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Compel Audit against defendant(s) Kuehne & Nagel Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7871379) Attorney Russell J Reid added to party Northwest Administrators Inc(pty:pla), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less