This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2023 at 18:49:01 (UTC).

Northwest Administrators Inc v. CY Expo LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Northwest Administrators Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against CY Expo LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00139

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Administrators Inc

Defendant

CY Expo LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell J Reid

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) CY Expo LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7869713), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant CY Expo LLC (CR) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/7/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/14/2023. (LC) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Continue Court Dates, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Court Dates) Noting Date 3/2/2023, (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

5 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Court Dates

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on CY Expo LLC on 3/14/2023, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Continue Court Dates. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is continued to 4/6/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is continued to 4/13/2023, Joint Status Report is now due by 4/20/2023. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LH) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Continue Court Dates. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is continued to 4/6/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is continued to 4/13/2023, Joint Status Report is now due by 4/20/2023. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LH) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on CY Expo LLC on 3/14/2023, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Continue Court Dates, filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Continue Court Dates) Noting Date 3/2/2023, (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/7/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/14/2023. (LC) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant CY Expo LLC (CR) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CR) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) CY Expo LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7869713), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less