This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2023 at 18:50:39 (UTC).

Northwest Administrators Inc v. Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group Inc

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Northwest Administrators Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Aramark Uniform Career Apparel Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Administrators Inc

Defendant

Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell J Reid

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7869731), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group Inc (CR) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/7/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/14/2023. (LC) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated per the filing of Plaintiff's #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SB) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/7/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/14/2023. (LC) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group Inc (CR) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CR) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group Inc (Receipt # AWAWDC-7869731), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less