This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 08:58:39 (UTC).

Northwest Administrators Inc v. Americold Logistics LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Northwest Administrators Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Americold Logistics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John H. Chun. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00719

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John H. Chun

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northwest Administrators Inc

Defendant

Americold Logistics LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell J Reid

Attorney at REID, McCARTHY, BALLEW & LEAHY, LLP

100 West Harrison Street

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Americold Logistics LLC (MJV) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Americold Logistics LLC on 6/2/2022 (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated per the filing of Plaintiff's #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SB) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Americold Logistics LLC on 6/2/2022 (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Americold Logistics LLC (MJV) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketJudge John H. Chun added. (MJV) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators Inc (Reid, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds Pursuant to Audit against defendant(s) Americold Logistics LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-7569165), filed by Northwest Administrators Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reid, Russell) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less