This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 09:04:04 (UTC).

Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP v. GLE Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 Northstar Demolition Remediation, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GLE Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Silvia L. Carreno-Coll. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01547

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Silvia L. Carreno-Coll

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP

Defendant

GLE Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez

Attorney at Delgado & Fernandez

Po Box 11750, Fernandez Juncos Station

San Juan, PR 00910-1750

David E. Gurley-Crosier

Attorney at Gurley & Associates

601 South Osprey Ave.

Sarasota, FL 34236

Defendant Attorney

Raul Castellanos-Malave

Attorney at Development and Construction Law Group LLC

1507 Ponce De Leon Avenue

San Juan, PR 00909

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Motion to allow J. Travis Godwin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100081374) filed by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of GLE Associates, Inc. Responses due by 1/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time until January 19, 2022 to Plead by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of GLE Associates, Inc. (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) Modified on 12/27/2021 to add Motion for Extension of Time and edit DE title(ecc). (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Filing Exhibits by Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP upon GLE Associates, Inc. served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Gurley-Crosier, David) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Gurley-Crosier on behalf of Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP (Gurley-Crosier, David) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

5 #1

Summons

5 #5

Main Document

#3

(#3) Motion to allow Stuart Jay Levine to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7534066) filed by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP Responses due by 12/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to the Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GLE Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7533948.), filed by Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP. Service due by 2/15/2022, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Travis Godwin re: 13 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ecc) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 12/29/2021. (MRB) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion to allow J. Travis Godwin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100081374) filed by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of GLE Associates, Inc. Responses due by 1/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE: The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. The USDC for the District of Puerto Rico is a NextGen court and the filing of a notice of appearance is now required using your upgraded PACER account in order to start receiving notifications. For more information, visit the following link: #https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you. (ecc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER noted and granted #8 . Defendant shall file its answer to the complaint or otherwise plead by 1/19/2022. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 12/27/2021. (MRB) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll on 12/27/2021. (MRB) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance and Motion for Extension of Time until January 19, 2022 to Plead by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of GLE Associates, Inc. (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) Modified on 12/27/2021 to add Motion for Extension of Time and edit DE title(ecc). (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Filing Exhibits by Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP upon GLE Associates, Inc. served on 12/8/2021, answer due 12/29/2021. (Gurley-Crosier, David) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Gurley-Crosier on behalf of Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP (Gurley-Crosier, David) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to GLE Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Silvia L. Carreno-Coll (arg) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to allow Stuart Jay Levine to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7534066) filed by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP Responses due by 12/1/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to the Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GLE Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7533948.), filed by Northstar Demolition & Remediation, LP. Service due by 2/15/2022, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHSTAR DEMOLITION AND REMEDIATION LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raul Castellanos-Malave