This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 20:30:09 (UTC).

Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund et al v. Intralot Capital Luxembourg S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Intralot Capital Luxembourg S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06437

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund

HCN LP

Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP

Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC

CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund

CQS ACS Fund

Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP

Biwa Fund Limited

HDML Fund II LLC

CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited

Defendants

Intralot Capital Luxembourg S.A.

Intralot S.A.

Intralot Global Holdings B.V.

Intralot, Inc.

Intralot US Securities B.V.

Intralot U.S. Holdings B.V.

The Law Debenture Trust Corporation P.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Crystal Nix-Hines

Attorney at Quinn Emmanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP (LA)

865 S. Figueroa St., 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Debra Dubritz O'Gorman

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Kevin Samuel Reed

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Patricia Baron Tomasco

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

711 Louisiana St., Suite 500

Houston, TX 77002

Dennis H. Hranitzky

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Defendant Attorneys

Emil A. Kleinhaus

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Daniel Rosenblum

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Nicholas Charles Edmund Walter

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281-1047

 

Court Documents

#56

(#56) LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Emil Kleinhaus dated March 31, 2022. Document filed by Intralot Capital Luxembourg S.A., Intralot Global Holdings B.V., Intralot S.A., Intralot US Securities B.V., Intralot, Inc...(Kleinhaus, Emil) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#55

(#55) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, Biwa Fund Limited, CQS ACS Fund, CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund, CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited, HCN LP, HDML Fund II LLC, Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC, Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

54 #1

Exhibit A

54 #54

Main Document

#53

(#53) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #52 Motion to Amend/Correct #52 MOTION to Amend/Correct #46 Amended Complaint,, ., #1 Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/3/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

52 #1

Exhibit A

52 #52

Main Document

46 #1

Exhibit A

46 #46

Main Document

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Emil Kleinhaus dated March 31, 2022. Document filed by Intralot Capital Luxembourg S.A., Intralot Global Holdings B.V., Intralot S.A., Intralot US Securities B.V., Intralot, Inc...(Kleinhaus, Emil) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, Biwa Fund Limited, CQS ACS Fund, CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund, CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited, HCN LP, HDML Fund II LLC, Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC, Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #46 Amended Complaint,, against Intralot Capital Luxembourg S.A., Intralot Global Holdings B.V., Intralot S.A., Intralot U.S. Holdings B.V., Intralot US Securities B.V., Intralot, Inc., The Law Debenture Trust Corporation P.L.C..Document filed by HDML Fund II LLC, Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP, CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited, CQS ACS Fund, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund, Biwa Fund Limited, Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC, CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund, Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP. Related document: #46 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #52 Motion to Amend/Correct #52 MOTION to Amend/Correct #46 Amended Complaint,, ., #1 Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/3/2022) (tg) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION to Amend/Correct #46 Amended Complaint,, . Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, Biwa Fund Limited, CQS ACS Fund, CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund, CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited, HCN LP, HDML Fund II LLC, Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC, Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Intralot U.S. Holdings B.V...(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Law Debenture Trust Corporation P.L.C...(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kevin Reed dated February 1, 2022 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, Biwa Fund Limited, CQS ACS Fund, CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund, CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited, HCN LP, HDML Fund II LLC, Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC, Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Reed, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Law Debenture Trust Corporation P.L.C., re: #46 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, Biwa Fund Limited, CQS ACS Fund, CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund, CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited, HCN LP, HDML Fund II LLC, Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC, Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intralot U.S. Holdings B.V., re: #46 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, Biwa Fund Limited, CQS ACS Fund, CQS Credit Opportunities Master Fund, CQS Directional Opportunities Master Fund Limited, HCN LP, HDML Fund II LLC, Halcyon Eversource Credit LLC, Halcyon Vallee Blanche Master Fund LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intralot US Securities B.V., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intralot, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intralot Global Holdings B.V., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intralot S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intralot Capital Luxembourg S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP, Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Intralot Capital Luxembourg S.A., Intralot Global Holdings B.V., Intralot S.A., Intralot US Securities B.V., Intralot, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24857082)Document filed by Northlight European Fundamental Credit Fund, Bardin Hill Event-Driven Master Fund LP, HCN LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Hranitzky, Dennis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emil A. Kleinhaus