This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2021 at 09:25:11 (UTC).

Northland LLC, et al. v. Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Northland LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Contractors Bonding Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Nye and Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00281

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David C. Nye

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kayla Briggs

Northland LLC

Defendant

Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leland Faux

Attorney at Leland Faux, Esq. PLLC

381 Shoup Ave, Ste 214

Idaho Falls, ID 83402

Defendant Attorneys

Anne E Henderson

Attorney at Duke Evett, PLLC

Keely E. Duke

Attorney at Duke Evett, PLLC

P.O. Box 7387

1087 West River Street, SUIT 300

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company. (Duke, Keely)

#8

(#8) DISCOVERY PLAN by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company re #7 Litigation Order,, . (Duke, Keely)

#7

(#7) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on August 23, 2021,at 9:30 a.m. mountain time, (Boise chambers) for purpose of confirming the deadlinesproposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiffs must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-1026 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before August 16, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kayla Briggs and Northland LLC an Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company Counsel for re #1 Notice of Removal #2 and Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/31/2021. (lm)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent Data and Staff Service Co. for Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company. (Duke, Keely)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company.(Duke, Keely)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company. (Duke, Keely)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCOVERY PLAN by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company re #7 Litigation Order,, . (Duke, Keely)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on August 23, 2021,at 9:30 a.m. mountain time, (Boise chambers) for purpose of confirming the deadlinesproposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. Plaintiffs must initiate the conference call by placing it to (208) 334-1026 and must have all appropriate parties on the line. On or before August 16, 2021, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Kayla Briggs and Northland LLC an Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company Counsel for re #1 Notice of Removal #2 and Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/31/2021. (lm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 4:21-cv-00281-DCN for all future filings. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing herself from any further proceedings in this matter. The Clerk is requested to reassign this matter to another judge. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company served on 7/1/2021. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (lm) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent Data and Staff Service Co. for Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company. (Duke, Keely)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company.(Duke, Keely)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company from Bonnveille, case number CV10-21-3056.(Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2238747.), filed by Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Docket, #4 Notice of Summons and Complaint, #5 Cover Sheet)(Duke, Keely) Modified on 7/2/2021, to add names of exhibits (jd).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRACTORS BONDING AND INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant