This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2020 at 10:48:26 (UTC).

Northland Insurance Company v. ARL VIC Trucking, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Northland Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ARL VIC Trucking, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00966

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northland Insurance Company

1560 Broadway #850

Denver, CO 80203

Defendant

ARL VIC Trucking, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carolyn J. Fairless

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Defendant Attorney

Phillip Mark Khalife

Attorney at Frascona Joiner Goodman & Greenstein, P.C.

4750 Table Mesa Drive

Boulder, CO 80305-5541

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/26/2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's second Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines [filedMay 22, 2020; ECF #21 ] is granted. In addition, the Scheduling Conference currently set for June 3, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to June 25, 2020, at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (apesa, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#21

(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant ARL VIC Trucking, LLC. (Khalife, Phillip) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#18

(#18) MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/15/2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF 17), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (apesa, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#17

(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Northland Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#16

(#16) MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/11/2020. ARL VIC Trucking, LLC answer due 5/26/2020.(tsher, ) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Answer by Defendant ARL VIC Trucking, LLC. (Khalife, Phillip) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northland Insurance Company. ARL VIC Trucking, LLC served on 4/19/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Fairless, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of Northland Insurance CompanyAttorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carolyn J. Fairless on behalf of Northland Insurance CompanyAttorney Carolyn J. Fairless added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Fairless, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

2 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #5

Exhibit 4 - Reservation of Rights Letter 04-03-20

2 #4

Exhibit 3 - Reservation of Rights Letter and Disclaimer Letter 01-21-20

2 #3

Exhibit 2 - Colorado Truck Application - 2-1-19_Redacted

2 #2

Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Northland Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7239616)Attorney Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Colorado Truck Application - 2-1-19_Redacted, #4 Exhibit 3 - Reservation of Rights Letter and Disclaimer Letter 01-21-20, #5 Exhibit 4 - Reservation of Rights Letter 04-03-20, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/26/2020. For good cause shown, Defendant's second Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines [filedMay 22, 2020; ECF #21 ] is granted. In addition, the Scheduling Conference currently set for June 3, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to June 25, 2020, at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (apesa, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM regarding #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by ARL VIC Trucking, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/22/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant ARL VIC Trucking, LLC. (Khalife, Phillip) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/18/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00966-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (apesa, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/15/2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF 17), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (apesa, ) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Northland Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/11/2020. ARL VIC Trucking, LLC answer due 5/26/2020.(tsher, ) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Answer by Defendant ARL VIC Trucking, LLC. (Khalife, Phillip) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northland Insurance Company. ARL VIC Trucking, LLC served on 4/19/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Fairless, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-966-MEH (angar, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#8) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company for Northland Insurance Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of Northland Insurance CompanyAttorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carolyn J. Fairless on behalf of Northland Insurance CompanyAttorney Carolyn J. Fairless added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Fairless, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Northland Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7239616)Attorney Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Northland Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Colorado Truck Application - 2-1-19_Redacted, #4 Exhibit 3 - Reservation of Rights Letter and Disclaimer Letter 01-21-20, #5 Exhibit 4 - Reservation of Rights Letter 04-03-20, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#1) Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHLAND INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant