Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2021 at 11:49:19 (UTC).

Northfield Insurance Company v. TX10 Industrial, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Northfield Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TX10 Industrial, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00078

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northfield Insurance Company

Defendant

TX10 Industrial, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alissa Puckett

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Wm Lance Lewis

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT... In accordance with the Courts Order (ECF No. 7) issued this date, the Court finds it appropriate to issue this Final Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Therefore, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/3/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER... Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal in which it seeks an order of dismissal without prejudice. See Notice, ECF No. 6. Defendant has not filed an answer or appeared. Thus, pursuant to this Notice, the Court finds that this case should be and hereby is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/3/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Northfield Insurance Company (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to TX10 Industrial, LLC. (wxc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons as to TX10 Industrial, LLC filed by NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc. for NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit(s) 2

1 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TX10 INDUSTRIAL, LLC filed by NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11541854) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated Per Final Judgment #8 . (wxc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT... In accordance with the Courts Order (ECF No. 7) issued this date, the Court finds it appropriate to issue this Final Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Therefore, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/3/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER... Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal in which it seeks an order of dismissal without prejudice. See Notice, ECF No. 6. Defendant has not filed an answer or appeared. Thus, pursuant to this Notice, the Court finds that this case should be and hereby is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/3/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by Northfield Insurance Company (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to TX10 Industrial, LLC. (wxc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons as to TX10 Industrial, LLC filed by NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate The Travelers Companies, Inc. for NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Puckett, Alissa) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TX10 INDUSTRIAL, LLC filed by NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11541854) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Wm) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alissa Puckett