This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2021 at 15:12:33 (UTC).

Northern Security Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Northern Security Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-NuTone LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Hillman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-40027

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Northern Security Insurance Company

Defendant

Broan-NuTone LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward A. Bopp

Attorney at Monahan & Associates

113 Union Wharf East

Boston, MA 02109

William O. Monahan

Attorney at Monahan & Associates, P.C.

113 Union Wharf East

Boston, MA 02109

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher A. Duggan

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

Andrew D. Black

Attorney at Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo LLP.

55 Old Bedford Road

Lincoln, MA 01773

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1

1 #2

Category Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#5

#6

#8

#10

#11

#12

#14

(#14) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/16/2021 02:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2021. Discovery to be completed by 1/14/2022. Motions due by 7/15/2022(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Broan-NuTone LLC. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Broan-NuTone LLC. (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/16/2021 02:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2021. Discovery to be completed by 1/14/2022. Motions due by 7/15/2022(Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docket(#13) Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Scheduling Conference held on 5/6/2021, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for scheduling conference, Court adopts parties proposed scheduling order deadlines, Scheduling Order to issue, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Bopp/Black) (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATE COURT Record. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 3/16/2021 to add RE- before the word Assignment (Finn, Mary). (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (King, Dawn) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Black on behalf of Broan-NuTone LLC (Black, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent nortek, inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC.. (Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broan-NuTone LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8667688 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Category Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duggan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northern Security Ins. Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D. Black

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Duggan