This case was last updated from PACER on 10/31/2020 at 07:48:01 (UTC).

Northcutt v. Fulton et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Northcutt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Fulton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00885

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Northcutt

Defendants

Fulton Trucking LLC

Brent Fulton

Great West Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott R Jackson

Attorney at Martin Jean & Jackson - OKLAHOMA CITY

13900 N Portland, Suite 150

Oklahoma City, OK 73134

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel K Jones

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

Mehry Taremi

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

Christopher B Moore

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Fulton Trucking LLC. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

12 #6

Exhibit No. 6 - Collision Report

12 #5

Exhibit No. 5 - Dissolution Certificate

12 #4

Exhibit No. 4 - Reinstatement Certificate

12 #3

Exhibit No. 3 - Articles of Dissolution

12 #2

Exhibit No. 2 - Application for Reinstatement

12 #1

Exhibit No. 1 - Inactive Certificate

#12

(#12) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1 - Inactive Certificate, #2 Exhibit No. 2 - Application for Reinstatement, #3 Exhibit No. 3 - Articles of Dissolution, #4 Exhibit No. 4 - Reinstatement Certificate, #5 Exhibit No. 5 - Dissolution Certificate, #6 Exhibit No. 6 - Collision Report)(Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of All Defendants (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Summons GWCC

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Summons FT

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons Fulton

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Kay County, case number CJ-2020-71 filed by Great West Casualty Company, Brent Fulton, Fulton Trucking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Fulton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons FT, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons GWCC, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Fulton Trucking LLC. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Angela Northcutt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 4 - Application for Motor Carrier License, #2 Exhibit No. 5 - OCC Motor Carrier License, #3 Exhibit No. 6 - Liability Certificate of Insurance, #4 Exhibit No. 7 - Liability Certificate of Insurance, #5 Exhibit No. 8 - Liability Certificate of Insurance, #6 Exhibit No. 9 - Cancellation Notice for Motor Carrier License)(Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Supplement Response in Opposition to Defendant Great West Casualty Companys Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 9/30/20. (jw) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Supplement Response in Opposition to Defendant Great West Casualty Company's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Angela Northcutt. (Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Angela Northcutt. (Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Angela Northcutt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1 - Certificate of Insurance, #2 Exhibit No. 2 - Cancellation Notice, #3 Exhibit No. 3 - Certificate of Insurance)(Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1 - Inactive Certificate, #2 Exhibit No. 2 - Application for Reinstatement, #3 Exhibit No. 3 - Articles of Dissolution, #4 Exhibit No. 4 - Reinstatement Certificate, #5 Exhibit No. 5 - Dissolution Certificate, #6 Exhibit No. 6 - Collision Report)(Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angela Northcutt. (Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Great West Casualty Company . (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants.(Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Fulton Trucking LLC . (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Great West Casualty Company. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Partial by Brent Fulton, Fulton Trucking LLC. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3258864. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R Jackson on behalf of Angela Northcutt (Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher B Moore on behalf of All Defendants (Moore, Christopher) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of All Defendants (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Kay County, case number CJ-2020-71 filed by Great West Casualty Company, Brent Fulton, Fulton Trucking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Fulton, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons FT, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons GWCC, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less