This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2020 at 08:36:10 (UTC).

North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Titan Retail Development Industries, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 North American Specialty Insurance Company filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Titan Retail Development Industries, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10539

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Tarnow

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North American Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Nadia Vlahos

Titan Retail Development Industries, LLC

Oakland Plumbing Co.

Marybeth Scott

Dina J. Anthony

George D. Anthony, Jr.

Stamatios Vlahos

Michael J. Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica L. Wynn

Omar J Harb

Jeffrey M. Frank

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit A - Indemnity Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit B - Correspondence from Plaintiff's counsel to Defendants demand in

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Michael Scott

6 #2

Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Marybeth Scott

6 #3

Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Dina Anthony

6 #4

Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Stamatios Vlahos

6 #5

Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Nadia Vlahos

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dina J. Anthony served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020; Oakland Plumbing Co. served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020; Marybeth Scott served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020; Michael J. Scott served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020; Nadia Vlahos served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020; Stamatios Vlahos served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Michael Scott, #2 Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Marybeth Scott, #3 Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Dina Anthony, #4 Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Stamatios Vlahos, #5 Document Continuation Proof of Service Summons - Nadia Vlahos) (Frank, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued for *Dina J. Anthony, George D. Anthony, Jr., Oakland Plumbing Co., Marybeth Scott, Michael J. Scott, Titan Retail Development Industries, LLC, Nadia Vlahos, Stamatios Vlahos* (DAll) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2020

DocketREQUEST for SUMMONS for All Defendants. (Wynn, Jessica) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica L. Wynn appearing on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Wynn, Jessica) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Omar J Harb appearing on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Harb, Omar) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020

DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-7647569 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Indemnity Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence from Plaintiff's counsel to Defendants demand indemnification and collateral security) (Frank, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less