This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2021 at 09:55:46 (UTC).

North American Specialty Insurance Company v. QSR Steel Corporation LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 North American Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against QSR Steel Corporation LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Janet Bond Arterton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet Bond Arterton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North American Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

David D. Rusconi

QSR Steel Corporation, LLC

QSR Properties LLC

Glenn C. Salamone

Quality Stair & Rail, LLC

Quality Companies, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert M. Barrack

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-CT

95 Glastonbury Boulevard, Suite 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

Peter E. Strniste, Jr.

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

95 Glastonbury Boulevard, Suite 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

Tasia E. Perkins

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

95 Glastonbury Boulevard, Suite 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

Defendant Attorney

Paul G. Ryan

Attorney at Welby, Brady & Greenblatt, LLP - Stamford

One Landmark Sq., 5Th Fl.

Stamford, CT 10606

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by QSR Properties LLC, QSR Steel Corporation, LLC, Quality Companies, Inc, Quality Stair & Rail, LLC, David D. Rusconi, Glenn C. Salamone.(Ryan, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#20

(#20) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by QSR Properties LLC, QSR Steel Corporation, LLC, Quality Companies, Inc, Quality Stair & Rail, LLC. (Ryan, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#19

RESTRICTED

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Tasia E. Perkins on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Seal Portions of Exhibit A to Complaint by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. Glenn C. Salamone served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. QSR Properties LLC served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. Quality Companies, Inc served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *QSR Properties LLC, QSR Steel Corporation, LLC, Quality Companies, Inc, Quality Stair & Rail, LLC, David D. Rusconi, Glenn C. Salamone* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter E. Strniste, Jr.* *Gordon & Rees, LLP* *95 Glastonbury Boulevard Suite 206* *Glastonbury, CT 06033*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#3

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#2

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit General Indemnity Agreement

#1

(#18) EXHIBIT A by North American Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by QSR Properties LLC, QSR Steel Corporation, LLC, Quality Companies, Inc, Quality Stair & Rail, LLC, David D. Rusconi, Glenn C. Salamone.(Ryan, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) First Corporate Disclosure Statement by QSR Properties LLC, QSR Steel Corporation, LLC, Quality Companies, Inc, Quality Stair & Rail, LLC. (Ryan, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Sealed Document: Exhibit A - General Indemnity Agreement by North American Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint . (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) EXHIBIT A by North American Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Tasia E. Perkins on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Seal Portions of Exhibit A to Complaint by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Perkins, Tasia) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. David D. Rusconi served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. Glenn C. Salamone served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. QSR Properties LLC served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. Quality Companies, Inc served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to QSR Properties LLC. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Barrack on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *QSR Properties LLC, QSR Steel Corporation, LLC, Quality Companies, Inc, Quality Stair & Rail, LLC, David D. Rusconi, Glenn C. Salamone* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter E. Strniste, Jr.* *Gordon & Rees, LLP* *95 Glastonbury Boulevard Suite 206* *Glastonbury, CT 06033*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/26/2021 Discovery due by 8/27/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021 Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2021.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketJudge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6406431.), filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit General Indemnity Agreement)(Barrack, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quality is a litigant

Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tasia E. Perkins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter E. Strniste, Jr.