This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2021 at 09:07:18 (UTC).

North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Ott et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 North American Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02138

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North American Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Hunter Allied of Texas, Inc.

Hunter Allied of Maryland, Inc.

Bradford Q Ott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Morris Fitzgerald

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1219 Fm 314

Van, TX 75790

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

7 #2

Summons

7 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2021. (Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hunter Allied of Maryland, Inc., filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hunter Allied of Texas, Inc., filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bradford Q Ott, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26678996) filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Robert M. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice by North American Specialty Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2021. (Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hunter Allied of Maryland, Inc., filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Hunter Allied of Texas, Inc., filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bradford Q Ott, filed.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26678996) filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company.(Fitzgerald, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M Fitzgerald