This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 07:09:08 (UTC).

North American Company v Weisberg

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 North American Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Weisberg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judith E. Levy and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-12540

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judith E. Levy

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interpleaders

North American Company for Life and Health Insurance

Andrea Weisberg

Sharlane Leshinsky

Interpleaders and Defendants

Andrea Weisberg

Sharlane Leshinsky

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Interpleader Attorney

Jeffrey Thomas Hewlett

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

500 Woodward Aveste 3500

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorney

Christopher R. Schaedig

Attorney at Denenberg Tuffley, PLLC

28411 Northwestern Hwy, Suite 600

Southfield, MI 48034

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance against North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8671310 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Des Moines County, Iowa - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Mecklenburg County, North Carolina. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Contract, #3 Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request, #4 Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request, #5 Exhibit Letter and Endorsement, #6 Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request, #7 Exhibit Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest) (Hewlett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

1 #2

Exhibit Contract

1 #3

Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request

1 #4

Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request

1 #5

Exhibit Letter and Endorsement

1 #6

Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request

1 #7

Exhibit Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Sharlane Leshinsky* (SKra) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Andrea Weisberg* (SKra) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher R. Schaedig appearing on behalf of Andrea Weisberg (Schaedig, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. North American Company for Life and Health Insurance waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Hewlett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sharlane Leshinsky served on 12/11/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Hewlett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Andrea Weisberg. (Schaedig, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Andrea Weisberg. (Schaedig, Christopher) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sharlane Leshinsky served on 12/11/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Hewlett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. North American Company for Life and Health Insurance waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Hewlett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher R. Schaedig appearing on behalf of Andrea Weisberg (Schaedig, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Christopher R. Schaedig re #4 Attorney Appearance. Other The document contains fillable fields. Document must be flattened with no fillable fields. Document was stricken and must be refiled correctly.. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) [STRICKEN] ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher R. Schaedig appearing on behalf of Andrea Weisberg (Schaedig, Christopher) Modified on 12/7/2021 (NAhm). (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Andrea Weisberg* (SKra) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Sharlane Leshinsky* (SKra) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by North American Company for Life and Health Insurance against North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8671310 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Des Moines County, Iowa - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Mecklenburg County, North Carolina. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Contract, #3 Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request, #4 Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request, #5 Exhibit Letter and Endorsement, #6 Exhibit Beneficiary Change Request, #7 Exhibit Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest) (Hewlett, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant