Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2020 at 10:02:20 (UTC).

North American Company for Life and Health Insurance v. Robert McIntyre

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 North American Company for Life and Health Insurance filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Robert McIntyre. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen E. Scott and Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01608

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North American Company for Life and Health Insurance

Defendant

Robert McIntyre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edith S Shea

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Keiko J Kojima

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-124) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Mark C. Scarsi, this case is transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01608 MCS-KESx. (rrp) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#9

(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/23/2020. (lb) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#4

(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance, (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

1 #1

Exhibits 1 and 2 to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27818681 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2 to Complaint) (Attorney Edith S Shea added to party North American Company for Life and Health Insurance(pty:pla))(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-124) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Mark C. Scarsi, this case is transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01608 MCS-KESx. (rrp) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/23/2020. (lb) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance, (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27818681 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff North American Company for Life and Health Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2 to Complaint) (Attorney Edith S Shea added to party North American Company for Life and Health Insurance(pty:pla))(Shea, Edith) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North American Company for Life and Health Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edith S Shea

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keiko J Kojima